Global Patent Index - EP 2027508 A2

EP 2027508 A2 2009-02-25 - MEMORY UNIT FOR PRODUCING RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGES, AND METHOD FOR READING SUCH A MEMORY UNIT

Title (en)

MEMORY UNIT FOR PRODUCING RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGES, AND METHOD FOR READING SUCH A MEMORY UNIT

Title (de)

SPEICHEREINHEIT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DURCHSTRAHLUNGSBILDERN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM AUSLESEN EINER SOLCHEN

Title (fr)

UNITÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR LA FABRICATION D'IMAGES PAR TRANSPARENCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE

Publication

EP 2027508 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07725271 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004355 W
  • DE 102006024861 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134769A2] An X-ray image memory unit comprises a plurality of memory film pieces (20-1 to 20-4) which can be moved between a recording configuration, in which they are situated one behind the other, and a scan configuration, in which they are individually accessible to reading light.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 42/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03B 42/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024861 A1 20071129; EP 2027508 A2 20090225; JP 2009544001 A 20091210; US 2010127187 A1 20100527; WO 2007134769 A2 20071129; WO 2007134769 A3 20091203

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20131015

2013-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMS, PROF. DR. MICHAEL

2012-02-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMS, PROF. DR. MICHAEL

2010-01-06 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20091203

2009-09-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS