Global Patent Index - EP 2027512 A2

EP 2027512 A2 2009-02-25 - TIMEPIECE WITH A CALENDAR NUMBER MECHANISM

Title (en)

TIMEPIECE WITH A CALENDAR NUMBER MECHANISM

Title (de)

UHRMACHERTEIL MIT KALENDERZIFFERNMECHANISMUS

Title (fr)

PIECE D'HORLOGERIE MUNIE D'UN MECANISME DE QUANTIEME

Publication

EP 2027512 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07729699 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055287 W
  • EP 06115263 A
  • EP 07729699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1868047A1] The timepiece has a date mechanism with a month module comprising a cam advancing in step per month. A correction module (28) is driven by a minute gear train and cooperates with the module. The module (28) has a mobile (28a) cooperating with a correction wheel (18a) for advancing the wheel, for number of steps equal to day of the month and less than 31. The wheel (18a) has a spring (18d) and a jumper (22) that are connected to a display wheel (18b) for permitting it to advance, in end of month, for number of steps equal to that advanced by the wheel (18a) during the month that is completed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/253 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/2536 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144268A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1868047 A1 20071219; CN 101467109 A 20090624; CN 101467109 B 20110209; EP 2027512 A2 20090225; JP 2009540310 A 20091119; JP 5068816 B2 20121107; KR 20090031560 A 20090326; US 2009201770 A1 20090813; US 7782715 B2 20100824; WO 2007144268 A2 20071221; WO 2007144268 A3 20080320; WO 2007144268 A8 20081211

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1126556

2015-05-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141202

2012-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120928

2009-11-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TIMEPIECE WITH A CALENDAR NUMBER MECHANISM

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-09-04 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1126556

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081209

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS