Global Patent Index - EP 2027514 A2

EP 2027514 A2 2009-02-25 - SIMULATION SYSTEM INCLUDING MOTION CONTROLLER

Title (en)

SIMULATION SYSTEM INCLUDING MOTION CONTROLLER

Title (de)

SIMULATIONSSYSTEM MIT BEWEGUNGSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS DE COMMANDE DE MOUVEMENT ET SYSTÈMES DE SIMULATION COMPRENANT DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMANDE DE MOUVEMENT

Publication

EP 2027514 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07795070 A

Priority

  • US 2007011995 W
  • US 80240606 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007139733A2] A motion controller including a computer comprising a primary processor or a central processing unit and an input/output communication bus. The primary processor is in communicative connection with the bus and is adapted to communicate with other devices in communicative connection with the bus via the bus. The motion controller also includes at least one secondary processor in communicative connection with the bus. The secondary processor is adapted to execute at least one control algorithm for one or more axes of motion associated therewith. The secondary processor is further adapted to communicate with other devices in communicative connection with the bus via the bus independently of the primary processor (that is, the secondary processor is can effect bus mastering). The operating system of the computer can, for example, be a general purpose operating system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/042 (2006.01); G06F 17/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/4148 (2013.01); G05B 2219/23445 (2013.01); G05B 2219/23446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007139733A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007139733 A2 20071206; WO 2007139733 A3 20080403; CA 2659209 A1 20071206; EP 2027514 A2 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20121218

2012-12-18 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IDEAL AEROSMITH, INC.

2009-08-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS