Global Patent Index - EP 2027526 A2

EP 2027526 A2 2009-02-25 - TOUCH SCREEN LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY

Title (en)

TOUCH SCREEN LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY

Title (de)

TOUCHSCREEN-FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE

Title (fr)

ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE TACTILE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 2027526 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07812071 A

Priority

  • US 2007070722 W
  • US 80436106 P
  • US 88397907 P
  • US 76006007 A
  • US 76003607 A
  • US 76008007 A
  • US 76004907 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007146779A2] Disclosed herein are liquid-crystal display (LCD) touch screens that integrate the touch sensing elements with the display circuitry. The integration may take a variety of forms. Touch sensing elements can be completely implemented within the LCD stackup but outside (not between) the color filter plate and the array plate. Alternatively, some touch sensing elements can be between the color filter and array plates with other touch sensing elements not between the plates. In another alternative, all touch sensing elements can be between the color filter and array plates. The latter alternative can include both conventional and in-plane- switching (IPS) LCDs. In some forms, one or more display structures can also have a touch sensing function. Techniques for manufacturing and operating such displays, as well as various devices embodying such displays are also disclosed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/041 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0412 (2013.01); G02F 1/13338 (2013.01); G02F 1/134363 (2013.01); G06F 3/0416 (2013.01); G06F 3/044 (2013.01); G06F 2203/04103 (2013.01); G06F 2203/04112 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007146779 A2 20071221; WO 2007146779 A3 20080424; AU 2007257869 A1 20071221; AU 2007257869 B2 20110217; AU 2008101177 A4 20090108; AU 2008101177 B4 20090709; CN 101467119 A 20090624; CN 101467119 B 20130213; CN 101467120 A 20090624; CN 101467120 B 20121212; CN 101501613 A 20090805; CN 101501613 B 20141001; CN 101501618 A 20090805; CN 101501618 B 20120606; DE 112007001290 T5 20090702; EP 2027526 A2 20090225; EP 2027528 A2 20090225; EP 2027528 B1 20120801; EP 2330491 A2 20110608; EP 2330491 A3 20110831; EP 2330492 A2 20110608; EP 2330492 A3 20111123; EP 2330492 B1 20171018; EP 2330493 A2 20110608; EP 2330493 A3 20111123; EP 2330493 B1 20161102; EP 2330494 A2 20110608; EP 2330494 A3 20111123; GB 0820662 D0 20081217; GB 0822136 D0 20090114; GB 0822138 D0 20090114; GB 2455179 A 20090603; GB 2455179 B 20110112; GB 2455208 A 20090603; GB 2455208 B 20100811; GB 2456221 A 20090715; GB 2456221 B 20110112; KR 101062042 B1 20110902; KR 101109355 B1 20120221; KR 20090019903 A 20090225; KR 20090028626 A 20090318; WO 2007146783 A2 20071221; WO 2007146783 A3 20080904

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1129752

2011-08-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110707

2009-12-04 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1129752

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS