Global Patent Index - EP 2027552 A2

EP 2027552 A2 2009-02-25 - UNIVERSAL SECURE REGISTRY

Title (en)

UNIVERSAL SECURE REGISTRY

Title (de)

SICHERE UNIVERSALREGISTRIERUNG

Title (fr)

AUTHENTIFICATION SÉCURISÉE UNIVERSELLE

Publication

EP 2027552 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07812063 A

Priority

  • US 2007070701 W
  • US 81227906 P
  • US 85923506 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007146771A2] A system and method for validating an identity of a user to enable or prevent an occurrence of an event is disclosed. In one embodiment, the system includes a first device including a wireless transmitter which is configured to transmit validation information, a second device including a wireless receiver configured to receive the validation information and to further transmit the validation information, and a secure system in communication with the second device. The secure system includes a database configured to receive the validation information transmitted from the second device, and to transmit additional information to the second device following a receipt of the validation information to assist the second device in either enabling or preventing the occurrence of the event.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/32 (2013.01); G06F 21/35 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/35 (2013.01); G06F 21/32 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/40145 (2013.01); G06Q 20/40975 (2013.01); G07C 9/00103 (2013.01); G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G07C 9/00071 (2013.01); G07C 9/00111 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007146771A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007146771 A2 20071221; WO 2007146771 A3 20080508; WO 2007146771 B1 20080717; EP 2027552 A2 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160629

2016-03-16 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160218

2016-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 21/32 20130101AFI20160202BHEP

2016-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSAL SECURE REGISTRY, LLC

2012-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSAL SECURE REGISTERY, LLC

2012-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEISS, KENNETH P.

2011-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110124

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS