Global Patent Index - EP 2027579 A1

EP 2027579 A1 2009-02-25 - ULTRASOUND SENSOR

Title (en)

ULTRASOUND SENSOR

Title (de)

ULTRASCHALLSENSOR

Title (fr)

CAPTEUR PAR ULTRASONS

Publication

EP 2027579 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725046 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004124 W
  • DE 102006028212 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144047A1] The invention relates to an ultrasound sensor (2), in particular a vehicle ultrasound sensor, with a housing (4) with a membrane (6) mounted in or on a ring-shaped section (12) of the housing (4), and with a decoupling element (10) which extends at least in some sections between the membrane (6) and the ring-shaped housing section (12), at least one material recess (14 to 20) being provided in the ring-shaped housing section (12), and at least one material recess (14 to 20) viewed in the circumferential direction of the housing section (12) occupying at least 10% of the total circumference of the housing section (12).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/22 (2006.01); G01S 7/521 (2006.01); G01S 15/93 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144047A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006028212 A1 20071220; EP 2027579 A1 20090225; WO 2007144047 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090407

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEHLING, HANS-WILHELM

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUPERNAGEL, UWE

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETZOLD, MANUEL

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRUEDL, DIETMAR

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUNG, THOMAS

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEHLING, HANS-WILHELM

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUPERNAGEL, UWE

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETZOLD, MANUEL

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRUEDL, DIETMAR

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUNG, THOMAS

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS