Global Patent Index - EP 2027690 A2

EP 2027690 A2 2009-02-25 - METHOD FOR GENERATION OF A USER-SPECIFIC TRANSMISSION EXCLUSION LIST AND METHOD FOR FORWARDING MESSAGES IN A DECENTRALISED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GENERATION OF A USER-SPECIFIC TRANSMISSION EXCLUSION LIST AND METHOD FOR FORWARDING MESSAGES IN A DECENTRALISED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ERSTELLEN EINER TEILNEHMERSPEZIFISCHEN SENDERAUSSCHLUSSLISTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM WEITERLEITEN VON NACHRICHTEN IN EINEM DEZENTRALEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉTABLIR UNE LISTE D'EXCLUSION D'EXPÉDITEUR(S) SPÉCIFIQUE À UN ABONNÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE MESSAGES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DÉCENTRALISÉ

Publication

EP 2027690 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07729373 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054934 W
  • DE 102006024008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135145A2] At least one transmitter for exclusion is described by giving at least one piece of address information about the transmitter in order to generate a user-specific transmitter exclusion list (L). For each given piece of address information, an irreversible unambiguous representation is generated, deposited in a first list (L1), stored in the decentralised communication system as a user-specific transmitter exclusion list (L). In order to forward messages, a message (5) from a transmitter (1) with provided address information (AS) for forwarding to an addressee (2) is received. The transmitter exclusion list specific to the addressee (2) is read from the decentralised communication system. An irreversible unambiguous representation of the address information of the transmitter is generated and compared with the entries in the user-specific transmitter exclusion list that has been read. Should the irreversible unambiguous representation of the address information of the transmitter not correspond with any of the entries in the user-specific exclusion list, the message is forwarded to the addressee.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06027 (2013.01); H04L 51/12 (2013.01); H04L 63/0407 (2013.01); H04L 65/1079 (2013.01); H04M 3/436 (2013.01); H04M 7/006 (2013.01); H04L 51/28 (2013.01); H04W 4/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135145A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024008 A1 20071129; EP 2027690 A2 20090225; WO 2007135145 A2 20071129; WO 2007135145 A3 20080214

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151001

2013-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SOLUTIONS AND NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2009-08-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090406

2009-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 29/06 20060101AFI20090126BHEP

2009-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 12/56 20060101ALI20090126BHEP

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR