Global Patent Index - EP 2027691 A1

EP 2027691 A1 2009-02-25 - WIRELESS NETWORKING COMMUNICATION

Title (en)

WIRELESS NETWORKING COMMUNICATION

Title (de)

DRAHTLOSE NETZWERKKOMMUNIKATION

Title (fr)

COMMUNICATION PAR RÉSEAU SANS FIL

Publication

EP 2027691 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07733235 A

Priority

  • GB 2007002231 W
  • GB 0611911 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144638A1] A server operable to offer resources to a client device is provided. The server comprises client negotiation means for establishing a communications link between the server and a client device, user input action signal receiving means for receiving a signal indicative of a user input action at the client device, and user session management means operable to establish and operate a user session in response to receipt of a user input action signal indicative of a user request therefor. The user session management means is further operable to request application facilities as required and comprises display rendering means operable to render data defining a display output to be displayed at a cooperating client device, and display data transmitting means for transmitting, to the client device, on the communications link, display data for direct representation at the client device as a user output. Also provided is a facility hosting means operable to host an instance of an application or a proxy thereof, and operable thereby to provide an application facility to the user session management means in response to a request therefor.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 67/08 (2013.01); H04L 67/10 (2013.01); H04L 67/28 (2013.01); H04L 67/2838 (2013.01); H04L 67/38 (2013.01); H04L 63/0281 (2013.01); H04L 63/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144638A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007144638 A1 20071221; EP 2027691 A1 20090225; GB 0611911 D0 20060726

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130103

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-08-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DATA MOTION LIMITED

2009-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS