Global Patent Index - EP 2027696 A1

EP 2027696 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD AND DETECTOR DEVICE FOR BLOCKING UNWANTED TELEPHONE CALLS TRANSMITTED VIA AN INTERNET PROTOCOL-BASED NETWORK

Title (en)

METHOD AND DETECTOR DEVICE FOR BLOCKING UNWANTED TELEPHONE CALLS TRANSMITTED VIA AN INTERNET PROTOCOL-BASED NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND DETEKTORVORRICHTUNG ZUR ABWEHR VON ÜBER EIN INTERNET-PROTOKOLL-BASIERENDES NETZ ÜBERTRAGENEN UNERWÜNSCHTEN TELEFONANRUFEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION POUR SE PROTÉGER D'APPELS TÉLÉPHONIQUES INDÉSIRABLES TRANSMIS PAR UN RÉSEAU IP

Publication

EP 2027696 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07785512 A

Priority

  • DE 2007000915 W
  • DE 102006023759 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134584A1] The invention relates to a method for blocking unwanted telephone calls transmitted via an Internet protocol-based network, i.e. spam over Internet telephony (SPIT). Said method comprises the following steps: a) an automated detector device analyzes and verifies an incoming telephone call to a subscriber line based on preset criteria, e.g. the telephone number, for connecting the telephone call (S1); b) the incoming telephone call is classified into a group i) of unwanted telephone calls (by means of a black list) or a group ii) of wanted telephone calls (by means of a white list) based on the verification made in step a) (S2); and c) the incoming telephone call is handled differently in accordance with the classification made in step b) (S3 to S6), i.e. the call is accepted for wanted callers, or the call is rejected or forwarded to an answering machine for unwanted callers, and the language is analyzed for callers who cannot be identified.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04M 3/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/436 (2013.01); H04L 29/06027 (2013.01); H04L 51/12 (2013.01); H04L 65/103 (2013.01); H04L 65/104 (2013.01); H04L 65/1079 (2013.01); H04M 2203/2005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134584A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006023759 A1 20071122; EP 2027696 A1 20090225; WO 2007134584 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160722

2016-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160311

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS