Global Patent Index - EP 2027700 A1

EP 2027700 A1 2009-02-25 - TRANSMISSION OF DATA BETWEEN A SERVER AND A COMMUNICATING OBJECT

Title (en)

TRANSMISSION OF DATA BETWEEN A SERVER AND A COMMUNICATING OBJECT

Title (de)

ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN ZWISCHEN EINEM SERVER UND EINEM KOMMUNIZIERENDEN OBJEKT

Title (fr)

TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ENTRE UN SERVEUR ET UN OBJET COMMUNICANT

Publication

EP 2027700 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07728425 A

Priority

  • EP 2007053969 W
  • FR 0651534 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007125054A1] A transmission of data (D) between a download server (ST) and a communicating object (CP) through a communications network (RP-RR) is initiated by a registration server (ST) by transmitting connection parameters received from the download server to the communicating object via a first data channel (CD1) opened by a first agent (AV) of the communicating object after attaching said object to the network. As a function of the connection parameters, a second agent (APl-AP2) in the communicating object opens a second data channel (CD2) to the download server so as to transmit the data therein. As long as the first data channel is open, other servers can initiate a transmission via the registration server.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/00 (2009.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04W 76/02 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 76/11 (2018.02); H04W 4/50 (2018.02); H04W 4/60 (2018.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007125054 A1 20071108; CN 101529966 A 20090909; CN 101529966 B 20111116; EP 2027700 A1 20090225; JP 2009535873 A 20091001; JP 4950282 B2 20120613; US 2009307358 A1 20091210

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-01-06 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151209

2015-12-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 76/02 20090101ALI20151126BHEP

2015-12-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 29/08 20060101ALI20151126BHEP

2015-12-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 4/00 20090101AFI20151126BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090312

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS