Global Patent Index - EP 2027702 A1

EP 2027702 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NETWORKING AN AUTOMATED INSTALLATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NETWORKING AN AUTOMATED INSTALLATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERNETZUNG EINER AUTOMATISIERTEN ANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN RÉSEAU D'UNE INSTALLATION AUTOMATISÉE

Publication

EP 2027702 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07730115 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055808 W
  • DE 102006027683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144364A1] The invention relates to a method for networking an automated installation, where the automated installation has at least one cell, where the cell has a subnetwork, where the subnetwork is linked via a router to a further subnetwork in the automated installation, and where the method has the following steps: - provision of a second multicast group, the second multicast group extending via the subnetwork and the further subnetwork; - detection of a second network address for a network interface of an assembly using the second multicast group, the assembly having previously joined the second multicast group via the second network address, the network interface having previously been connected to the subnetwork; - allocation of a name to the network interface of the assembly via the second network address. In a further step, a third network address for the network interface of the assembly is ascertained which has at least part of a numerical representation of the name.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/12 (2006.01); G05B 19/418 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/12216 (2013.01); H04L 29/12801 (2013.01); H04L 61/2007 (2013.01); H04L 61/6004 (2013.01); H04L 69/16 (2013.01); H04L 69/167 (2013.01); H04L 29/1232 (2013.01); H04L 61/2092 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144364A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006027683 A1 20071220; EP 2027702 A1 20090225; WO 2007144364 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140102

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERLMANN, MARKUS

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LOHMEYER, JOACHIM

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TALANIS, THOMAS

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS