Global Patent Index - EP 2027732 A2

EP 2027732 A2 2009-02-25 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BATTERY MANAGEMENT IN A CONVERGED WIRELESS TRANSMIT/RECEIVE UNIT

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BATTERY MANAGEMENT IN A CONVERGED WIRELESS TRANSMIT/RECEIVE UNIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BATTERIEVERWALTUNG IN EINER KONVERGIERTEN DRAHTLOSEN SENDE-/EMPFANGSEINHEIT

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR GESTION DE BATTERIES DANS UNE UNITÉ D'ÉMISSION/RÉCEPTION SANS FIL CONVERGENTE

Publication

EP 2027732 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07794635 A

Priority

  • US 2007011076 W
  • US 79919606 P
  • US 82756806 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007133526A2] The present invention is a method and apparatus for minimizing power consumption in a converged WTRU. In a preferred embodiment, power consumption is minimized by coordinating battery management of the various RATs supported by the converged WTRU. A coordinated multi-RAT battery management (CMRBM) unit is used by the converged WTRU to minimize power consumption. The CMRBM unit monitors various power and link metrics of the various RATs supported by the converged WTRU, and coordinates power states of the converged WTRU.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/02 (2009.01); H04W 88/06 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/0216 (2013.01); H04W 88/06 (2013.01); Y02D 70/1224 (2018.01); Y02D 70/1226 (2018.01); Y02D 70/1242 (2018.01); Y02D 70/142 (2018.01); Y02D 70/24 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007133526 A2 20071122; WO 2007133526 A3 20080306; CN 101444131 A 20090527; CN 101444131 B 20120418; EP 2027732 A2 20090225; JP 2009536804 A 20091015; JP 5036808 B2 20120926; KR 101289601 B1 20130807; KR 20090014201 A 20090206; KR 20090018732 A 20090220; TW 200814557 A 20080316; TW 200947888 A 20091116; TW I364918 B 20120521; TW I423704 B 20140111

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111215

2011-08-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 52/02 20090101AFI20110627BHEP

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081209

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS