Global Patent Index - EP 2027892 A1

EP 2027892 A1 2009-02-25 - Stationary pedalling apparatus convertible into seat

Title (en)

Stationary pedalling apparatus convertible into seat

Title (de)

In einen Sitz umwandelbare stationäre Pedalvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de pédalage stationnaire convertible en siège

Publication

EP 2027892 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07380238 A

Priority

EP 07380238 A

Abstract (en)

Static pedalling fitness apparatus (1) that, with great accuracy, simulates the real excercise of pedalling on a conventional road biclycle while standing up and swinging the bicycle sideways. For this purpose, the fitness apparatus (1) comprises a fixed part (2) which is basically unmovable with respect to the floor, a movable part (3) which is capable of swinging laterally with respect to the fixed part (2) and which includes the set of pedals (4) and the seat (5), and another tilting part that is the handlebar (6) of the apparatus (1). The handlebar (6) is capable of oscillating separately from the oscillation of the movable part (3), i.e. the handlebar (6) presents a relative swinging movement with respect to the set of pedals (4) and the seat (5).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/06 (2006.01); A63B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/0605 (2013.01); A63B 2022/0641 (2013.01); A63B 2023/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027892 A1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160903

2016-05-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160422

2016-05-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63B 22/06 20060101AFI20160408BHEP

2016-05-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63B 23/00 20060101ALI20160408BHEP

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090713

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS