Global Patent Index - EP 2027895 A2

EP 2027895 A2 2009-02-25 - Game playing apparatus simulating a ball game

Title (en)

Game playing apparatus simulating a ball game

Title (de)

Spielvorrichtung zum Simulieren eines Ballspiels

Title (fr)

Appareil de jeu simulant un jeu de balle

Publication

EP 2027895 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08162777 A

Priority

GB 0716321 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for playing a game that is representative of a ball game, the apparatus comprising a counter that is representative of a playing implement used in the ball game, a counter that is representative of a ball used in the ball game and a game playing surface that simulates an environment for playing the ball game, wherein the apparatus is arranged such that squeezing the periphery of the counter representative of the ball against the playing surface by means of the counter representative of the playing implement causes the counter representative of the ball to leave the game playing surface in a manner representative of a ball hit by the playing implement during the ball game.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 7/06 (2006.01); A63F 7/20 (2006.01); A63F 7/30 (2006.01); A63F 7/36 (2006.01); A63F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 7/0668 (2013.01); A63F 7/0628 (2013.01); A63F 7/249 (2013.01); A63F 2003/00258 (2013.01); A63F 2007/3005 (2013.01); A63F 2007/3607 (2013.01); A63F 2007/3614 (2013.01); A63F 2007/3625 (2013.01); A63F 2007/3655 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0086 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0295 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 1548291 A 19250804 - ARSDALE JR HENRY VAN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027895 A2 20090225; EP 2027895 A3 20120808; GB 0716321 D0 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130910

2013-05-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/06 20060101AFI20130412BHEP

2013-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/36 20060101ALN20130412BHEP

2013-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/30 20060101ALN20130412BHEP

2013-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 9/02 20060101ALN20130412BHEP

2013-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/20 20060101ALI20130412BHEP

2013-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 9/02 20060101ALN20130315BHEP

2013-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/36 20060101ALN20130315BHEP

2013-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/20 20060101ALI20130315BHEP

2013-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/30 20060101ALN20130315BHEP

2013-04-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/06 20060101AFI20130315BHEP

2013-04-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 9/02 20060101ALN20130311BHEP

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/36 20060101ALN20130311BHEP

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/06 20060101AFI20130311BHEP

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/20 20060101ALI20130311BHEP

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/30 20060101ALN20130311BHEP

2013-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130208

2012-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/36 20060101ALN20120629BHEP

2012-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/20 20060101ALI20120629BHEP

2012-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/06 20060101AFI20120629BHEP

2012-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 9/02 20060101ALN20120629BHEP

2012-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63F 7/30 20060101ALN20120629BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS