Global Patent Index - EP 2027939 A1

EP 2027939 A1 2009-02-25 - High pressure cleaning device

Title (en)

High pressure cleaning device

Title (de)

Hochdruckreinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de nettoyage haute pression

Publication

EP 2027939 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08104284 A

Priority

  • DE 102008012359 A
  • DE 202007018340 U

Abstract (en)

The high pressure cleaning device has a high pressure cleaning equipment and a hose winding unit (1'), which is formed in a partly automated manner. The hose winding unit is formed as a high pressure hose winding unit. The hose winding unit has an actuator that is provided with a spring drive.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt ein Hochdruckreinigungsgerät mit einer Hochdruckreinigungsvorrichtung, welche eine Schlauchwickeleinheit (1') aufweist, die zumindest teilweise automatisiert ausgebildet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/026 (2013.01); B08B 2203/0276 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027939 A1 20090225; EP 2027939 B1 20101117; CN 101372009 A 20090225; CN 101372009 B 20130327; DE 102008012359 A1 20090226; DE 502008001808 D1 20101230

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130622

- Year of fee payment: 6

2011-12-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008001808

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110818

2010-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502008001808 P 20101230

2010-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2010-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090825

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090916

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS