Global Patent Index - EP 2027940 A1

EP 2027940 A1 2009-02-25 - High pressure cleaning device

Title (en)

High pressure cleaning device

Title (de)

Hochdruckreinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de nettoyage haute pression

Publication

EP 2027940 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08104318 A

Priority

  • DE 102008012357 A
  • DE 202007018339 U

Abstract (en)

The cleaning device has a device housing (10), a chassis (12), and a tube device comprising a spiral coiled tube (36) for elastic deformation, where the tube (36) is formed as a high-pressure tube. The chassis has rolling bodies (14, 16, 18), which are formed for clamping a device-supporting surface. One of the rolling bodies is laterally projected over a device base contour of the device housing. The chassis is formed by a stand. One of the rolling bodies is pivotably supported around a steering rotation axis (24). The stand is formed by a unit separated from the housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt ein Hochdruckreinigungsgerät mit einer Schlauchvorrichtung, welche einen Spiralschlauch (36) aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027940 A1 20090225; EP 2027940 B1 20110309

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140609

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130622

- Year of fee payment: 6

2012-04-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008002789

- Effective date: 20111212

2012-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111212

2011-04-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008002789

- Effective date: 20110421

2011-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502008002789 P 20110421

2011-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2011-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090825

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090916

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS