Global Patent Index - EP 2027941 A1

EP 2027941 A1 2009-02-25 - High pressure cleaning device

Title (en)

High pressure cleaning device

Title (de)

Hochdruckreinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de nettoyage haute pression

Publication

EP 2027941 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08104850 A

Priority

  • DE 202007018341 U
  • DE 102008012358 A

Abstract (en)

The cleaning device has a device housing (10), and a chassis (12) including rolling bodies (14, 16). The rolling bodies are designed for clamping a device supporting surface (22). The rolling bodies protrude over a device bottom counter of the device housing. The rolling bodies are formed of wheels, which have a receiving region for the device housing, and sidecars (30) for forming the receiving region. The rolling bodies rotate around a steering rotatable axis. The wheels have a flange at a front side.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt ein Hochdruckreinigungsgerät mit einem Gerätegehäuse (10) und mit einem Fahrwerk (12), wobei das Fahrwerk (12) zumindest drei Wälzkörper (14, 16, 18, 20) aufweist, die dazu vorgesehen sind eine Geräteabstützfläche (22) aufzuspannen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027941 A1 20090225; EP 2027941 B1 20130227

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170723

2018-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180330

2018-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170723

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2014-03-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008009323

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131128

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 6

2013-04-25 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008009323

- Effective date: 20130425

2013-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2013-02-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090825

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090916

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS