Global Patent Index - EP 2027950 A2

EP 2027950 A2 2009-02-25 - Device for heating holders for dies

Title (en)

Device for heating holders for dies

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erwärmen von Haltemitteln für Gesenke

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage de moyens de fixation pour matrices

Publication

EP 2027950 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014203 A

Priority

DE 202007011764 U

Abstract (en)

Device for heating a holders for dies comprises heaters formed as heating elements (31) for an infrared radiator (33).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Erwärmen von Haltemitteln (H) für Gesenke, mit zumindest einem Tragmittel (2), das geeignet und eingerichtet ist mehrere Heizmittel (3) zu tragen. Durch die Erfindung wird eine Vorrichtung zum Erwärmen von Haltemitteln für Gesenke vorgeschlagen, bei denen Heizmittel vorgesehen sind, die einerseits ohne Verbrennung auskommen und andererseits eine aufwändige Kompensation von Blindlasten entbehrlich macht. Das wird dadurch erreicht, dass die Heizmittel (3) für Infrarotstrahler (31) als Heizelemente (31) geeignet und eingerichtet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 37/16 (2006.01); B21J 13/03 (2006.01); B23P 19/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 37/16 (2013.01); B21J 13/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 2003056562 A1 20030327 - KAMANO TOSHIHISA [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007011764 U1 20071018; EP 2027950 A2 20090225; EP 2027950 A3 20121107

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180103

2013-07-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130507

2012-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B21J 13/03 20060101ALI20120928BHEP

2012-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B21D 37/16 20060101AFI20120928BHEP

2012-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B30B 15/02 20060101ALI20120928BHEP

2012-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B23P 19/02 20060101ALI20120928BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS