Global Patent Index - EP 2027952 A2

EP 2027952 A2 2009-02-25 - Methods and apparatus for heat treatment and sand removal for castings

Title (en)

Methods and apparatus for heat treatment and sand removal for castings

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung und Sandentfernung für Gussteile

Title (fr)

Procédés et appareil pour traitement thermique et suppression de sable pour moulages

Publication

EP 2027952 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08167057 A

Priority

  • EP 03785083 A
  • US 40196902 P

Abstract (en)

A method of processing a casting comprising: pouring a molten material into a mold containing a core; solidifying at least a portion of the molten material to form a casting; heat treating the casting while the casting is in the die; and applying a fluid flow to the casting to heat treat the casting and degrade at least a portion of the core, wherein the core comprises a binder that is soluble in the fluid flow.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 29/00 (2006.01); B22C 19/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/00 (2013.01); B22D 29/002 (2013.01); B22D 29/003 (2013.01); B22D 29/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004014581 A2 20040219; WO 2004014581 A3 20051013; AU 2003259701 A1 20040225; CA 2495514 A1 20040219; CA 2495514 C 20091103; CN 100335208 C 20070905; CN 1753746 A 20060329; EP 1575722 A2 20050921; EP 2027952 A2 20090225; EP 2027952 A3 20100120; EP 2027953 A2 20090225; EP 2027953 A3 20100120; HK 1087664 A1 20080125; JP 2006504531 A 20060209; MX PA05001393 A 20050428

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-09-22 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CRAFTON, SCOTT, P.

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CRAFTON, PAUL, M.

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNOBLOCH, VOLKER, R.

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEWIS, JAMES, L., JR.

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRENCH, IAN

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUEGG, FRANZ

2009-02-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1575722 P

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR