Global Patent Index - EP 2027954 A2

EP 2027954 A2 2009-02-25 - Dry powder metal compositions and methods of making and using the same

Title (en)

Dry powder metal compositions and methods of making and using the same

Title (de)

Trockenpulver-Metallzusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Compositions métalliques en poudre sèche et ses procédés de fabrication et d'utilisation

Publication

EP 2027954 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08160951 A

Priority

US 82842007 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides powder metal compositions and methods of making and using the same. Powder metal compositions according to the invention are substantially dry and include a blend of base metal particles and a pressing aid. The pressing aid includes a micronized deformable solid material and a high melt point lubricating material, which have been pre-mixed or co-ground with each other. Powder metal compositions according to the present invention are particularly useful in applications where the pre-sintered density of the pressed metal part is less than or equal to about 6.9 g/cm 3 .

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027954 A2 20090225; EP 2027954 A3 20090513; US 2009028742 A1 20090129

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100408

2010-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2009-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091127

2009-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091106

2009-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS