Global Patent Index - EP 2027971 A2

EP 2027971 A2 2009-02-25 - Press clamp for radial pressing of pipes, pipe sections and similar

Title (en)

Press clamp for radial pressing of pipes, pipe sections and similar

Title (de)

Presszange zum radialen Verpressen von Rohren, Rohrstücken und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Pince de pression destinée à la compression radiale de tuyaux, éléments de tuyaux et analogues

Publication

EP 2027971 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014576 A

Priority

DE 102007040895 A

Abstract (en)

The clamp has pressing jaws (1, 2) e.g. double armed levers, which are pivoted relative to each other and respectively comprise a retainer (22) for a workpiece e.g. pipe, to be pressed. The jaws are provided with guiding elements (27) that prevent displacement of the jaws in a direction of a pivot axis (3) over a large portion of the pivoting distance of the jaws. The guiding elements of the jaws are formed as a part of teeth, and are extended upto the retainer. The guiding elements are engaged with each other by the large part of the pivoting motion of the jaws.

Abstract (de)

Die Presszange hat zwei Pressbacken (1, 2), die relativ zueinander verschwenkbar sind und jeweils eine Aufnahme (22) für das zu verpressende Werkstück aufweisen. Um mit der Presszange die Werkstücke mit hoher Pressqualität einfach verpressen zu können, sind die beiden Pressbacken (1, 2) mit Führungselementen (27) versehen, die über den größten Teil des Schwenkweges zumindest der einen Pressbacke (1, 2) eine Verschiebung der Pressbacke(n) (1, 2) in Richtung der Schwenkachse (3, 4) verhindern. Die beiden Pressbacken (1, 2) behalten während des gesamten Pressvorganges ihre axiale Lage bezüglich der Schwenkachse (3, 4) bei. Die Presszange ermöglicht eine einwandfreie Verpressung der Werkstücke, so dass sich eine sehr hohe Pressqualität ergibt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027971 A2 20090225; EP 2027971 A3 20100804; EP 2027971 B1 20131127; DE 102007040895 A1 20090226; ES 2447038 T3 20140311

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-12-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008011001

- Effective date: 20140828

2014-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140828

2014-08-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008011001

2014-03-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2447038 T3

- Effective date: 20140311

2014-01-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008011001

- Effective date: 20140123

2013-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2013-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: REMS GMBH & CO KG

2013-07-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130617

2012-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120307

2011-04-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2011-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110204

2010-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS