Global Patent Index - EP 2027972 A1

EP 2027972 A1 2009-02-25 - Hand tool with reciprocating drive

Title (en)

Hand tool with reciprocating drive

Title (de)

Handwerkzeugmaschine mit Hubantrieb

Title (fr)

Machine-outil avec entraînement linéaire alternatif

Publication

EP 2027972 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08104550 A

Priority

DE 102007000452 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a lift drive (13) for a tool operated by a motor, and comprising a lifting body (30) moved in a lifting movement by an eccentric pin (18) of an eccentric wheel (17). The eccentric wheel is rotationally displaced by the motor, where the lift movement of the lifting body is spring elastically absorbed. The lifting body is formed as a single piece of a spring elastic body, where the lifting body includes resilience in tension direction and pressure direction. Bearing lugs (34) are connected with each other by a sheet-shaped spring section (35) using a piston rod (31).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Handwerkzeugmaschine mit einem über einen Motor betreibbaren Hubantrieb (13) für ein Werkzeug, der einen Hubkörper (30) aufweist, welcher über einen Excenterzapfen (18) eines vom Motor in Rotation versetzbaren Excenterrades (17) in eine Hubbewegung versetzbar ist und wobei die Hubbewegung des Hubkörpers (30) federelastisch gedämpft ist. Der Hubkörper (30) ist dabei als einteiliger, zumindest bereichsweise federelastischer Körper ausgebildet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/12 (2006.01); B25D 17/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/12 (2013.01); B25D 17/24 (2013.01); B25D 2211/003 (2013.01); B25D 2222/42 (2013.01); B25D 2250/085 (2013.01); B25D 2250/371 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027972 A1 20090225; EP 2027972 B1 20110907; DE 102007000452 A1 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130626

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130626

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502008004756

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130626

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130627

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-10-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008004756

- Effective date: 20120611

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 5

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120619

- Year of fee payment: 5

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 5

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120612

- Year of fee payment: 5

2012-08-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120611

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120612

- Year of fee payment: 5

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-12-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-11-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008004756

- Effective date: 20111103

2011-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090825

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS