Global Patent Index - EP 2027979 A1

EP 2027979 A1 2009-02-25 - Method for manufacturing conductive wood material boards and same

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing conductive wood material boards and same

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von leitfähigen Holzwerkstoffplatten und solche Holzwerkstoffplatten

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de plaques en bois conductrices et de telles plaques en bois conductrices

Publication

EP 2027979 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08014789 A

Priority

DE 102007039267 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves providing a preform with a main portion of lignocellulose containing fibers, chips and strands mixed with an adhesive, and hot pressing a conductive wood material board i.e. medium density fiberboard. The hot-pressed wood material board is powder-coated. The adhesive is made of a phenol-formaldehyde adhesive and a low molecular protein-containing component e.g. wheat protein-containing component, for increasing the conductivity of the wood material board. An alkali, earth alkali or ammonium salt is utilized.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von beschichteten Holzwerkstoffplatten. Genauer betrifft die vorliegende Erfindung ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von beschichteten Holzwerkstoffplatten, die mit einem Klebstoff aus einer Phenolformaldehyd-Klebstoff-Komponente und einer niedermolekularen proteinhaltigen natürlichen Komponente hergestellt sind und anschließendem Beschichten dieser Holzwerkstoffplatten. In einem weiteren Aspekt betrifft die vorliegende Erfindung beschichtete Holzwerkstoffplatten, die mit dem erfindungsgemäßen Verfahren erhältlich sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/00 (2006.01); B27N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/00 (2013.01); B27N 3/002 (2013.01); B27N 7/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2027979 A1 20090225; EP 2027979 B1 20130306; DE 102007039267 A1 20090226; DE 102007039267 B4 20130404; ES 2405315 T3 20130530

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170811

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170810

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170905

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-09-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-09-01 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-09-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KRONOTEC AG, CH

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: SWISS KRONO TEC AG, CH

- Document: AT 599340 T

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-07-05 [REG NL HC] CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)

- Owner name: SWISS KRONO TEC AG; CH

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGE OF OWNER(S) NAME; FORMER OWNER NAME: KRONOTEC AG

- Effective date: 20170421

2017-06-02 [REG SK TC4A] CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME

- Owner name: SWISS KRONO TEC AG, LUZERN, CH

- Document: SK E 13973

- Effective date: 20170523

2017-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SWISS KRONO TEC AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KRONOTEC AG, CH

2017-02-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SWISS KRONO TEC AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KRONOTEC AG, LUZERN, CH

- Document: DE 502008009392

2017-02-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008009392

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-08-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008009392

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2015-07-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO

- Effective date: 20080820

2015-06-30 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2014-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130820

2014-05-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2014-03-20 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008009392

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-11-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-10-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130706

2013-10-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-10-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130708

2013-09-30 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-08-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130607

2013-08-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-08-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-08-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2013-07-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-07-31 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-07-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-07-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2013-07-02 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 13973

2013-06-19 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2013-05-30 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2405315 T3

- Effective date: 20130530

2013-05-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2013-05-02 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008009392

- Effective date: 20130502

2013-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG, CH

2013-03-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2013-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-03-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 599340 T

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-03-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091120

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090824

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS