Global Patent Index - EP 2028004 A2

EP 2028004 A2 2009-02-25 - Printing press for printing in multiple colours with an upstream coating device

Title (en)

Printing press for printing in multiple colours with an upstream coating device

Title (de)

Druckmaschine für den Mehrfarbendruck mit einer vorgeordneten Beschichtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Presse pour l'impression multicolore dotée d'un dispositif de revêtement en amont

Publication

EP 2028004 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08161773 A

Priority

DE 102007039125 A

Abstract (en)

The press has an upstream coating device (X) subordinating a dryer device (9) in a transporting direction of a printing substrate. A calendaring device (3) includes a roller leading the substrate or a cylinder (1) leading the substrate and a calendar roll (11) forming a press gap (16) with the roller or the cylinder. The calendar roll is mechanically decoupled from a main drive (18) with a gear train (17), and coupled with an individual drive (13) in a switching and signal technique such that the individual drive is drivable in pre-selectable manner against the main drive with the gear train.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Druckmaschine für den Mehrfarbendruck mit einer vorgeordneten Beschichtungseinrichtung für Bedruckstoffe. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zu Grunde eine Druckmaschine derart zu verbessern, dass ein Bedruckstoff während des Drucklaufs durch die Druckmaschine mit einer glatten, gleichmäßigen Beschichtung versehen ist bevor dieser Bedruckstoff den Druckspalt eines nachgeordneten Druckwerks passiert. Gelöst wird dies dadurch, indem der Beschichtungseinrichtung X in Förderrichtung 10 des Bedruckstoffes eine Trocknervorrichtung 9 nachgeordnet ist, der Trocknervorrichtung 9 eine Kalandriervorrichtung 3 nachgeordnet sowie der Kalandriervorrichtung 3 das Erste der Druckwerke A - C für den Mehrfarbendruck nachgeordnet ist, und dass die Kalandriervorrichtung 3 einen den Bedruckstoff führenden Gegendruckzylinder 1 und wenigstens eine, mit dem Gegendruckzylinder 1 einen Pressspalt 16 bildende erste Kalanderwalze 11 umfasst, dass die Kalanderwalze 11 mechanisch von einem Hauptantrieb 18 mit Räderzug 17 entkoppelt und schaltungs- und signaltechnisch mit einem Einzelantrieb 13 gekoppelt ist, wobei der Einzelantrieb 13 in vorgebbaren Weise gegenüber dem Hauptantrieb 18 mit Räderzug 17 antreibbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 25/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/004 (2006.01); B41F 19/00 (2006.01); B41F 23/08 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/08 (2013.01); B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41F 19/001 (2013.01); B41F 25/00 (2013.01); B41F 33/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028004 A2 20090225; DE 102007039125 A1 20090219; JP 2009045936 A 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140311

2014-05-07 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2014-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 33/00 20060101ALI20140319BHEP

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 13/004 20060101ALI20140319BHEP

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 19/00 20060101ALI20140319BHEP

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 23/08 20060101ALI20140319BHEP

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 25/00 20060101AFI20140319BHEP

2013-11-27 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20140203

2012-03-21 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20120201

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS