Global Patent Index - EP 2028012 A1

EP 2028012 A1 2009-02-25 - Head array unit and image forming apparatus

Title (en)

Head array unit and image forming apparatus

Title (de)

Kopfanordnungseinheit und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Unité de réseau de tête et appareil de formation d'images

Publication

EP 2028012 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08252639 A

Priority

JP 2007216353 A

Abstract (en)

A head array unit (100) includes a plurality of liquid discharging heads (1) configured to discharge liquid and a head supporter (20) configured to support the plurality of liquid discharging heads. The head supporter includes a plurality of liquid inlets (22), a channel system (23), and at least two ports (15). The plurality of liquid inlets is configured to supply liquid to the plurality of liquid discharging heads, respectively. The channel system is configured to sandwich or surround each of the plurality of liquid inlets and contain coolant to control a temperature of the head array unit. The at least two ports are connected to the channel system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1408 (2013.01); B41J 2/145 (2013.01); B41J 2202/12 (2013.01); B41J 2202/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 2006139419 A1 20060629 - SHIGEMURA YOSHIHIRO [JP]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028012 A1 20090225; EP 2028012 B1 20120321; JP 2009045905 A 20090305; JP 4949972 B2 20120613; US 2009051724 A1 20090226; US 8104859 B2 20120131

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-04-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008014246

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130102

2012-05-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008014246

- Effective date: 20120524

2012-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-03-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100830

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090414

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS