Global Patent Index - EP 2028075 A1

EP 2028075 A1 2009-02-25 - Rescue trolley for recovering and transporting transportation units of a cable transportation system

Title (en)

Rescue trolley for recovering and transporting transportation units of a cable transportation system

Title (de)

Rettungswagen zur Bergung und zum Transport von Transporteinheiten eines Kabeltransportsystems

Title (fr)

Chariot de secours pour le sauvetage et le transport d'unités de transport d'un système de transport de câbles

Publication

EP 2028075 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08162870 A

Priority

IT MI20071690 A

Abstract (en)

A rescue trolley (12), for recovering and transporting transportation units (9) of a cable transportation system (1) having at least one supporting cable (6) and a rescue pull cable (8), has a frame (13) guided along a given path (P) by the supporting cable (6); an anchoring device (14) for engaging a transportation unit (9); and a connecting device (15) for connecting the frame (13) to the rescue pull cable (8), and which has a first connecting assembly (22) fixed to the rescue pull cable (8), a second connecting assembly (23) hinged to the frame (13) and engaging the first connecting assembly (23) in sliding manner, and a third connecting assembly (24) secured to the frame (13) and engaging the first connecting assembly (22) in sliding manner; the rescue pull cable (8) drawing the rescue trolley (12) selectively by means of the first and second connecting assembly (22, 23) or the first and third connecting assembly (22, 24), depending on the pull direction of the rescue pull cable (8) and the slope of the supporting cable (6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028075 A1 20090225; EP 2028075 B1 20110216; AT 498526 T 20110315; DE 602008004955 D1 20110331; IT MI20071690 A1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: LEITNER S.P.A., IT

- Effective date: 20180605

2018-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: LEITNER S.P.A., IT

- Document: AT 498526 T

- Effective date: 20180509

2018-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LEITNER S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROPFIN B.V., NL

2018-02-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEITNER S.P.A., VIPITENO, IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROPFIN B.V., LEIMUIDEN, NL

- Document: DE 602008004955

2018-02-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-02-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ROPFIN B.V., NL

- Document: AT 498526 T

- Effective date: 20151218

2015-06-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ROPFIN B.V., NL

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-04-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROPFIN B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLIC INTERNATIONAL S.A R.L., LUXEMBOURG, LU

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Effective date: 20150306

2015-04-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEITNER S.P.A., VIPITENO, IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLIC INTERNATIONAL S.A R.L., LUXEMBOURG, LU

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Effective date: 20150306

2015-04-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20150306

2015-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ROPFIN B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLIC INTERNATIONAL S.A R.L., LU

2015-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

2014-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ROLIC INTERNATIONAL S.A.R.L., LU

- Document: AT 498526 T

- Effective date: 20140414

2013-08-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ROLIC INTERNATIONAL S.A.R.L., LU

- Effective date: 20130711

2013-07-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROLIC INTERNATIONAL S.A R.L., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLIC INVEST SARL, LUXEMBURG, LU

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-07-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROPFIN B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLIC INVEST SARL, LUXEMBURG, LU

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-07-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEITNER S.P.A., VIPITENO, IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLIC INVEST SARL, LUXEMBURG, LU

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, EUROPEA, DE

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-07-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-06-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ROLIC INTERNATIONAL S.A R.L., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLIC INVEST SARL, LU

2013-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Representative's name: MUELLER-BORE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, EUROPEA, DE

2012-03-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111117

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110527

2011-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP WENGER RYFFEL AG

2011-03-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008004955

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602008004955 P 20110331

2011-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS