Global Patent Index - EP 2028109 A2

EP 2028109 A2 2009-02-25 - Device for cutting gas-filled containers and assembly for producing gas-filled container strings

Title (en)

Device for cutting gas-filled containers and assembly for producing gas-filled container strings

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zuschneiden gasgefüllter Füllkörper sowie Anordnung zur Herstellung gasgefüllter Füllkörperstränge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe de corps de remplissage remplis de gaz et dispositif de fabrication de faisceaux de corps de remplissage remplis de gaz

Publication

EP 2028109 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08162867 A

Priority

  • DE 102007039987 A
  • DE 102007045938 A

Abstract (en)

The device (10) has a cutting equipment with a cutting unit for cutting gas-filled packings (12) in a connecting section (13) between two packings. A carrier (21) i.e. conveying tray, with an entrainment region (21a) accommodates the packings. The carrier is formed movably together with the packings such that the packings provided in the carrier are centered. A counting unit i.e. optical sensor (24), detects a number of packings that moved over a reference point. An evaluation and control unit detects data of the counting unit and actuates a cutting process by the cutting equipment. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) an arrangement for producing a gas-filled packing strand (2) a device for controlled transport feeding of a gas-filled packing.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Zuschneiden von gasgefüllten Füllkörpern (12), wobei die Füllkörper der Vorrichtung in Form eines Stranges aufeinanderfolgender, durch flach ausgebildete Verbindungsabschnitte (13) verbundener gasgefüllter Füllkörper zugeführt werden, ist eine Schneidvorrichtung (11) mit einem Schneidelement (15) zum Schneiden der gasgefüllten Füllkörper (12) im Verbindungsabschnitt (13) zwischen zwei Füllkörpern, wenigstens ein bevorzugt auf einem Rad (20) angeordneter Mitnehmer (21) mit einem Mitnahmebereich (21 a) zur Aufnahme eines Füllkörpers (12), wobei der Mitnehmer (21) zusammen mit dem Füllkörper (12) beweglich angeordnet ist und derart ausgebildet ist, dass der im Mitnehmer (21) befindliche Füllkörper (12) zentriert wird, eine Zähleinheit (23, 24) zum Erfassen einer Anzahl von Füllkörpern (12), die über einen Referenzpunkt bewegt werden, sowie eine Auswerte- und Steuereinheit zum Erfassen der Daten der Zähleinheit (23, 24) und zum Auslösen des Schnittvorgangs vorgesehen. Die Vorrichtung kann im Rahmen einer Anordnung zur Herstellung gasgefüllter Füllkörperstränge (12) dazu eingesetzt werden, Füllkörperstrangabschnitte mit individueller Füllkörperkissenzahl herzustellen, wobei die benötige Kissenzahl aus den Daten eines Warenwirtschaftssystems berechnet oder sensorisch bestimmt werden kann.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/20 (2006.01); B26D 1/06 (2006.01); B26D 5/20 (2006.01); B26D 7/28 (2006.01); B31D 5/00 (2006.01); B65B 61/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/20 (2013.01); B26D 7/20 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0058 (2013.01); B31D 2205/007 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0088 (2013.01); B65B 61/06 (2013.01); B65B 61/08 (2013.01); B65B 65/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102007045938 A1 20090226; EP 2028109 A2 20090225; EP 2028109 A3 20130717; US 2009049798 A1 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140118

2014-04-30 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-03-26 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2014-03-26 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2013-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 1/06 20060101ALI20130611BHEP

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 55/20 20060101AFI20130611BHEP

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 7/28 20060101ALI20130611BHEP

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B31D 5/00 20060101ALI20130611BHEP

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 5/20 20060101ALI20130611BHEP

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 61/08 20060101ALI20130611BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B31D 5/00 20060101ALI20130221BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 55/20 20060101AFI20130221BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 61/08 20060101ALI20130221BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 1/06 20060101ALI20130221BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 7/28 20060101ALI20130221BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B26D 5/20 20060101ALI20130221BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS