Global Patent Index - EP 2028113 A1

EP 2028113 A1 2009-02-25 - Banana transport tray comprising seats supporting a top tray which can be easily shaped, associated shaping method

Title (en)

Banana transport tray comprising seats supporting a top tray which can be easily shaped, associated shaping method

Title (de)

Transportschale für Bananen, die Halterungsstützen für die darüberliegende Schale umfasst und deren Formbarkeit erleichtert ist, sowie entsprechendes Formungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Plateau de transport de bananes comprenant des assises de support d'un plateau supérieur et dont la mise en forme est facilitée, procédé de mise en forme associé

Publication

EP 2028113 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08300257 A

Priority

FR 0757097 A

Abstract (en)

The tray has a reinforced sidewall (4) extending from a long side of a bottom wall, and positioning parts i.e. positioning bands (41a, 41b), for positioning seats (28a, 28b) at a supporting position. The parts occupy an initial position or an interposed position on a folding path of a foldable panel (40) when the panel is not folded, and occupy a removal position when the panel is folded. The parts are associated with the seats such that the seats occupy the supporting position when the parts occupy the removal position. An independent claim is also included for a method for forming a product e.g. banana, transporting tray.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un plateau de transport de bananes comprenant des assises pour un plateau supérieur et dont la mise en forme est facilitée. Selon l'invention, le plateau comprend une partie de positionnement (41a, 41b) de l'assise (28a, 28b) à la position d'appui, cette partie étant mobile entre une position interposée sur le chemin de repliement du panneau (40) et une position d'effacement qu'elle occupe lorsque le panneau (40) est replié, la partie de positionnement (41a, 41b) étant liée en mouvement avec l'assise (28a, 28b), de sorte que lorsque cette partie occupe la position d'effacement, l'assise (28a, 28b) occupe la position d'appui. L'invention trouve application dans le domaine des plateaux de transport de produits, tels que des fruits et légumes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/0045 (2013.01); B65D 85/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028113 A1 20090225; EP 2028113 B1 20120125; ES 2379699 T3 20120430; FR 2920147 A1 20090227; FR 2920147 B1 20120113

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140819

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130820

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-04-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120125

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2013-08-02 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-05-31 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

- Effective date: 20130502

2013-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121026

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 5

2012-04-30 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2379699 T3

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT TR

2009-12-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT TR

2009-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS