Global Patent Index - EP 2028114 A1

EP 2028114 A1 2009-02-25 - Folding box

Title (en)

Folding box

Title (de)

Faltschachtel

Title (fr)

Boîte pliable

Publication

EP 2028114 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08162195 A

Priority

DE 202007012067 U

Abstract (en)

The box has double-walled front walls (7, 8) foldable around its lower edge (6), where the front walls are locked against opening by co-operating with a foldable cover (5) in a closed condition. The cover has a locking strap that is formed for engaging in a slot in an upper edge of the double-walled front walls. The front walls engage with side latches (11) between two layers of double-walled side walls (16, 18). The cover engages in a recess of the side latches of the front walls by a slot (30) in an upper edge of the double-walled side walls.

Abstract (de)

Eine Faltschachtel enthält einen Boden (1,20), zwei Seitenwände (16,18), eine Rückwand (3), einen aufklappbaren Deckel (5) und eine aufklappbare Vorderwand (7,8). In geschlossenem Zustand wirken der aufklappbare Deckel (5) und die aufklappbare Vorderwand (7,8) zusammen, um ein unbeabsichtigtes Öffnen zu verhindern. Hierzu können an den Seitenkanten (25) des Deckels (5) zwei Stecklaschen (24) vorhanden sein, die in Ausnehmungen der Seitenlaschen der geschlossenen Vorderwand (7,8) eingreifen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/18 (2013.01); B65D 5/6685 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007012067 U1 20071031; AT 453575 T 20100115; DE 502008000286 D1 20100211; DK 2028114 T3 20100503; EP 2028114 A1 20090225; EP 2028114 B1 20091230; ES 2339076 T3 20100514; HR P20100132 T1 20100430; PT 2028114 E 20100324; SI 2028114 T1 20100430

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160812

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160813

2017-04-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-03-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-03-20 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-11-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140812

2015-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2013-10-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-10-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20130807

- Year of fee payment: 6

2013-10-31 [PGFP NO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Payment date: 20130814

- Year of fee payment: 6

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130212

2013-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130304

2013-05-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120813

2013-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-05-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-05-03 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 6919

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-05-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20100400494

- Effective date: 20130304

2013-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-04-30 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120813

2013-04-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120813

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-03-29 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG; CH

- Effective date: 20130212

2013-02-19 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130212

2013-01-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Document: AT 453575 T

- Effective date: 20121128

2012-10-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121004 AND 20121010

2012-10-02 [REG SK PC4A] ASSIGNMENT AND TRANSFER OF RIGHTS

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG, CHUR, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ADOLF WUERTH GMBH & CO. KG, KUENZELSAU, DE

- Document: SK E 6919

- Effective date: 20101220

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2012-09-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-07-30 [REG HU FH1C] APPOINTMENT OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: FORMER REPRESENTATIVE(S): KOVACS IVANNE, DANUBIA SZABADALMI ES JOGI IRODA KFT., HU

- Representative's name: DANUBIA SZABADALMI ES JOGI IRODA KFT., HU

2012-07-30 [REG HU GB9C] SUCCESSION IN TITLE

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER(S): ADOLF WUERTH GMBH & CO. KG, DE

2012-07-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WURTH INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Effective date: 20120625

2012-05-30 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120529

2012-05-22 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG, CH

- Effective date: 20120507

2012-05-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG

- Free text: ADOLF WUERTH GMBH & CO. KG#REINHOLD-WUERTH-STRASSE#74653 KUENZELSAU (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WUERTH INTERNATIONAL AG#ASPERMONTSTRASSE 1#7000 CHUR (CH)

2011-12-30 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091230

2011-11-30 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-11-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20110801

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110809

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-11-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20110826

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-11-30 [PGFP HR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-11-30 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091230

2010-08-30 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E007739

2010-07-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100330

2010-07-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091230

2010-07-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-06-07 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 6919

2010-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091230

2010-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20091230

2010-05-18 [REG NO T2] ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY

- Effective date: 20091230

2010-05-14 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2339076 T3

2010-05-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091230

2010-04-14 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-03-24 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20100315

2010-03-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20100400494

2010-03-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-03-01 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2010-02-26 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2010-02-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502008000286 P 20100211

2010-01-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-12-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090309

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS