Global Patent Index - EP 2028121 A2

EP 2028121 A2 2009-02-25 - Expansible bottle stopper

Title (en)

Expansible bottle stopper

Title (de)

Dehnbarer Flaschenstöpsel

Title (fr)

Bouchon de bouteille extensible

Publication

EP 2028121 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08013655 A

Priority

CN 200710143038 A

Abstract (en)

An expansible bottle stopper includes a body (1, 4), a resilient member (2, 5), and a movable member (3, 6) that is longitudinally movable relative to the body (1, 4). The resilient member (2, 5) is caused to expand radially by a first-stage longitudinal displacement of the movable member (3, 6) relative to the body (1, 4) or to shrink radially by a second-stage longitudinal displacement of the movable member (3, 6) relative to the body (1, 4).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/12 (2006.01); B65D 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/12 (2013.01); B65D 55/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028121 A2 20090225; EP 2028121 A3 20090923; CN 101372274 A 20090225; CN 101372274 B 20100818

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110210

2010-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 39/12 20060101AFI20100803BHEP

2010-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 55/02 20060101ALI20100803BHEP

2010-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100129

2009-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-09-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 39/12 20060101AFI20081114BHEP

2009-09-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 55/02 20060101ALI20090819BHEP

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080730

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS