Global Patent Index - EP 2028124 A2

EP 2028124 A2 2009-02-25 - Carton for packaging articles, package, blank, part-formed carton and method of packaging

Title (en)

Carton for packaging articles, package, blank, part-formed carton and method of packaging

Title (de)

Karton zum Einpacken von Artikeln, Verpackung, Zuschnitt, mehrteiliger Karton und Verfahren zum Verpacken

Title (fr)

Carton pour emballer des articles, emballage, ébauche, carton en plusieurs parties et méthode pour emballer

Publication

EP 2028124 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08162445 A

Priority

GB 0715910 A

Abstract (en)

A carton for retaining articles (B) comprising a top structure (16, 14, 12, 6) including a top panel (12) and means (48) for retaining an upper portion of an article. The carton comprising a bottom structure (8, 10) including a bottom panel (10) and means (80) for retaining a lower portion of the same article. The carton comprises a back panel (4). Wherein the means (48) for retaining an upper portion of an article comprises an article engaging means (48) for engaging a radially protruding portion of an article and wherein only the back panel (4) is connected to both the top structure (16, 14, 12, 6) and to the bottom structure (8, 10) and provides the only connection therebetween.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/12 (2006.01); B65C 3/00 (2006.01); B65C 9/00 (2006.01); B65C 9/02 (2006.01); B65C 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/02 (2013.01); B65C 3/00 (2013.01); B65C 9/00 (2013.01); B65D 71/0085 (2013.01); B65D 71/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028124 A2 20090225; EP 2028124 A3 20090401; GB 0715910 D0 20070926; RU 2008134063 A 20100220

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100129

2009-12-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090918

2009-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS