Global Patent Index - EP 2028133 A1

EP 2028133 A1 2009-02-25 - Long goods palette

Title (en)

Long goods palette

Title (de)

Langgutpalette

Title (fr)

Palette de marchandises longitudinales

Publication

EP 2028133 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08014441 A

Priority

DE 202007011805 U

Abstract (en)

The pallet (1) has a loading surface (2) accommodating goods to be transported, where the surface is extended in longitudinal and transverse directions (X, Y). Posts (A-L) are arranged at the loading surface. The posts are tiltable from a folded orientation into an erected orientation (4) for lateral fixing of the goods. Two of the posts are connected with each other by coupling units (KAB, KBC, KEF, KGH) to transfer pivoting movement of the posts (A-E) to the associated posts (B-F). The posts are connected with each other along a longitudinal side (5) of the surface.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Langgutpalette 1, insbesondere zum Transport von Profilen, mit einer sich in einer Längsrichtung X und einer Querrichtung Y erstreckenden Ladefläche 2 zur Aufnahme von Transportgut, wobei an der Ladefläche 2 mehrere Pfosten A, B, C, D, E... angeordnet sind, welche zur seitlichen Fixierung von Transportgut aus einer zur Ladefläche 2 im Wesentlichen parallelen, eingeklappten Ausrichtung 3 um eine Schwenkachse in eine aufgerichtete Ausrichtung (4) schwenkbar sind, wobei die Schwenkachse quer zur Längsrichtung X ausgerichtet ist und wenigstens zwei Pfosten A, B, C, D. E... entlang einer Längsseite über wenigstens ein Koppelelemente K, K AB , K BC , K CD ... miteinander verbunden sind, um die Schenkbewegung eines Pfostens A, B, C, D. E... auf den damit verbundenen Pfosten B, C, D. E, F... zu übertragen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/129 (2013.01); B65D 85/20 (2013.01); B65D 88/522 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1279611 B1 20060816 - SCHUECO INT KG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007011805 U1 20071025; EP 2028133 A1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100309

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090828

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090728

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS