Global Patent Index - EP 2028147 A2

EP 2028147 A2 2009-02-25 - Method for operating a rotary printing press

Title (en)

Method for operating a rotary printing press

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Rollendruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé destiné au fonctionnement d'une imprimante à rouleaux

Publication

EP 2028147 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014740 A

Priority

DE 102007039485 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves separating samples and forming a longitudinal fold and/or a transverse fold on the separated samples using a folding apparatus that is arranged downstream to a folding structure. Multiple components of the folding structure serving for processing a printing substrate web (10) and/or partial web are adapted to a breadth increase of the printing substrate web formed during the printing process. Former (12) and the folding structure are shifted transverse to a transport direction (11) of the printing substrate web.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Rollendruckmaschine, die mehrere Druckeinheiten zum Bedrucken mindestens einer Bedruckstoffbahn, einen den Druckeinheiten nachgeordneten Falzaufbau mit mindestens einem Falztrichter zum Längsfalzen der oder jeder Bedruckstoffbahn bzw. von Teilbahnen der oder jeder Bedruckstoffbahn, und einen dem Falzaufbau nachgeordneten Falzapparat zum Abtrennen von Exemplaren und zum Ausbilden mindestens eines Längsfalzes und/oder Querfalzes an den abtrennten Exemplaren aufweist. Erfindungsgemäß werden zumindest der Bearbeitung der oder jeder Bedruckstoffbahn bzw. der Teilbahnen dienende Baugruppen des Falzaufbaus an ein sich beim Bedrucken ausbildendes Breitenwachstum der oder jeder Bedruckstoffbahn angepasst.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/22 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01); B65H 45/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/221 (2013.01); B41F 13/58 (2013.01); B41F 13/60 (2013.01); B65H 35/02 (2013.01); B65H 45/28 (2013.01); B65H 2515/805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028147 A2 20090225; EP 2028147 A3 20100120; DE 102007039485 A1 20090226; US 2009050004 A1 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140311

2013-11-27 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20140203

2012-04-04 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100903

2010-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100618

2010-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS