Global Patent Index - EP 2028148 A2

EP 2028148 A2 2009-02-25 - Automatic winder

Title (en)

Automatic winder

Title (de)

Automatischer Wickler

Title (fr)

Enrouleur automatique

Publication

EP 2028148 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08012254 A

Priority

JP 2007215303 A

Abstract (en)

An automatic winder includes a rotationally driven traverse drum 8 and a cover member 9 located so as to face a traverse area of the traverse drum 8. The cover member 9 has a yarn catching member 30 including a yarn regulating portion 32 which regulates a cut end of a yarn. The yarn regulating portion 32 is located on at least one side of the traverse area at a position where the yarn regulating portion 32 faces a contact portion 28 between a peripheral surface of the traverse drum 8 and a package P. The yarn regulating portion 32 is formed upright so as to extend away from the peripheral surface of the traverse drum 8. An upright projecting end of the yarn regulating portion 32 is located in proximity to the peripheral surface of the package (Fig. 1).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/48 (2006.01); B65H 67/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/388 (2013.01); B65H 54/485 (2013.01); B65H 67/085 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0236502 A 19900206 - TOKO INC

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028148 A2 20090225; EP 2028148 A3 20091021; EP 2028148 B1 20101020; CN 101372296 A 20090225; CN 101372296 B 20121114; DE 602008003073 D1 20101202; JP 2009046268 A 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-11-17 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008003073

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110721

2010-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602008003073 P 20101202

2010-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2010-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2009-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091022

2009-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS