Global Patent Index - EP 2028150 A1

EP 2028150 A1 2009-02-25 - BRAKE SYSTEM OF ELEVATOR

Title (en)

BRAKE SYSTEM OF ELEVATOR

Title (de)

BREMSSYSTEM FÜR AUFZUG

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE D'UN ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 2028150 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06757346 A

Priority

JP 2006311998 W

Abstract (en)

A brake apparatus for an elevator includes a brake apparatus main body having a brake coil, and a discharge circuit connected in parallel to the brake coil. The brake apparatus main body serves to apply a braking force to a car by stopping the supply of electric power to the brake coil and release the braking force applied to the car by supplying electric power to the brake coil. The discharge circuit attenuates a current of the brake coil when the supply of electric power to the brake coil is stopped. In addition, the discharge circuit has a discharge parallel part that includes a resistor, and an overvoltage absorber which is connected in parallel to the resistor for maintaining a voltage impressed on the resistor within a predetermined range.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/32 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/32 (2013.01); B66D 5/30 (2013.01); H01F 7/1811 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028150 A1 20090225; EP 2028150 A4 20130313; CN 101360676 A 20090204; JP WO2007144948 A1 20091029; KR 100996057 B1 20101122; KR 20080089587 A 20081007; WO 2007144948 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130911

2013-03-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130211

2013-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01F 7/18 20060101ALI20130205BHEP

2013-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 1/32 20060101AFI20130205BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080624

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS