Global Patent Index - EP 2028199 A1

EP 2028199 A1 2009-02-25 - Propylene polymer and composition containing the same, molded object and laminate comprising these, and processes for producing propylene polymer and composition containinig the same

Title (en)

Propylene polymer and composition containing the same, molded object and laminate comprising these, and processes for producing propylene polymer and composition containinig the same

Title (de)

Propylenpolymer und Zusammensetzung damit, Formobjekt und Laminat damit sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung von Propylenpolymer und einer Zusammensetzung damit

Title (fr)

polymère de propylène et composition le contenant, objet moulé et stratifié les comprenant, et procédés pour la fabrication de polymère de propylène et composition le contenant

Publication

EP 2028199 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08167130 A

Previously Filed Application

07116939 19990625 EP

Priority

  • EP 07116939 A
  • EP 06123510 A
  • EP 99926823 A
  • JP 17925298 A
  • JP 21011598 A
  • JP 23987298 A
  • JP 30289298 A
  • JP 28399 A
  • JP 5502599 A
  • JP 7969499 A
  • JP 8649199 A
  • JP 9342099 A
  • JP 10399699 A

Abstract (en)

A propylenic polymer according to the present invention or a composition thereof have an excellent meld flowability and contains a less amount of stickiness-causing components, and also has a low modulus and is pliable, and is capable of providing a transparent molded article, thus being useful as a substitute for a pliable vinyl chloride resin. In addition, a molded article made therefrom exhibits an excellent heat seal performance at a low temperature, and is excellent in terms of transparency and rigidity. The polypropylenic resin composition comprises (A) 99 to 80% by weight of propylene homopolymer with the characteristics of (a1) to (a4): (a1) the intrinsic viscosity [·] is 0.5 to 5.0 dl/g; (a2) the molecular weight distribution (Mw/Mn) is 3.5 or less; (a3) the isotactic pentad fraction (mmmm (in percentage terms b y mole)) is 40 to 99 % by mole; and (a4) the isotactic pentad fraction (mmmm (in percentage terms by mole)) and the melting point (Tm (°C)) are in the relationship represented by the following formula (I): Tm ‰¤ [ mmmm ] + 65 and (B) 1 to 20 % by weight of a propylene homopolymer capable of forming an eutectic with component (A) under a rapid cooling condition upon film formation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 10/06 (2006.01); B32B 27/32 (2006.01); C07F 17/00 (2006.01); C08F 4/642 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01); C08F 110/06 (2006.01); C08F 210/16 (2006.01); C08J 5/18 (2006.01); C08L 23/10 (2006.01); C08F 4/659 (2006.01); C08F 210/06 (2006.01); C08L 23/02 (2006.01); C08L 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 17/00 (2013.01); C08F 10/00 (2013.01); C08F 10/06 (2013.01); C08F 110/06 (2013.01); C08F 210/16 (2013.01); C08J 5/18 (2013.01); C08L 23/10 (2013.01); C08F 4/65904 (2013.01); C08F 4/65912 (2013.01); C08F 4/65916 (2013.01); C08F 210/06 (2013.01); C08J 2323/10 (2013.01); C08L 23/02 (2013.01); C08L 23/12 (2013.01); C08L 2205/02 (2013.01); C08L 2314/06 (2013.01); Y10S 526/943 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 10/00 + C08F 2/001
  2. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/65927
  3. C08F 210/16 + C08F 2/44
  4. C08F 210/16 + C08F 2/001
  5. C08L 23/10 + C08L 2666/04
  6. C08F 110/06 + C08F 2500/15 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/03
  7. C08F 110/06 + C08F 2500/15 + C08F 2500/12 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/03 + C08F 2500/26 + C08F 2500/20
  8. C08F 210/06 + C08F 210/16 + C08F 2500/15 + C08F 2500/12 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/03 + C08F 2500/26 + C08F 2500/20
  9. C08F 210/06 + C08F 210/08 + C08F 2500/15 + C08F 2500/12 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/03 + C08F 2500/26 + C08F 2500/20
  10. C08F 210/06 + C08F 210/14 + C08F 2500/15 + C08F 2500/12 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/03 + C08F 2500/26 + C08F 2500/20

Citation (applicant)

CHENG H.N.; EWEN J.A., MACROMOL.CEM., vol. 190, 1989, pages 1350

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095951 A1 20010502; EP 1095951 A4 20040407; EP 1095951 B1 20070321; DE 69935591 D1 20070503; DE 69935591 T2 20070705; DE 69940652 D1 20090507; DE 69940653 D1 20090507; DE 69941035 D1 20090806; DE 69941036 D1 20090806; DE 69941037 D1 20090806; DE 69941039 D1 20090806; DE 69941231 D1 20090917; DE 69941915 D1 20100225; DE 69942438 D1 20100708; EP 1772467 A1 20070411; EP 1772467 B1 20090805; EP 1865005 A2 20071212; EP 1865005 A3 20080220; EP 1865005 B1 20090624; EP 1865006 A2 20071212; EP 1865006 A3 20080220; EP 1865006 A8 20080730; EP 1865006 B1 20090624; EP 1865007 A2 20071212; EP 1865007 A3 20080220; EP 1865007 B1 20090325; EP 1867662 A2 20071219; EP 1867662 A3 20080220; EP 1867662 B1 20090624; EP 1867662 B2 20130227; EP 1867663 A2 20071219; EP 1867663 A3 20080220; EP 1867663 B1 20090325; EP 1873172 A2 20080102; EP 1873172 A3 20080220; EP 1873172 B1 20090624; EP 2028198 A1 20090225; EP 2028198 B1 20100106; EP 2028199 A1 20090225; EP 2028199 B1 20100526; US 2005043495 A1 20050224; US 2006293471 A1 20061228; US 2009215973 A1 20090827; US 6906155 B1 20050614; US 7199202 B2 20070403; US 7544758 B2 20090609; WO 9967303 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69942438

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69942438

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69942438 P 20100708

2010-05-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1873172 P

2010-05-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1772467 P

2010-05-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1095951 P

2010-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090421

2009-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-02-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1873172 P

2009-02-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1772467 P

2009-02-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1095951 P

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE