Global Patent Index - EP 2028250 A1

EP 2028250 A1 2009-02-25 - LUMINESCENCE ENHANCER

Title (en)

LUMINESCENCE ENHANCER

Title (de)

LUMINESZENZVERSTÄRKER

Title (fr)

ACTIVATEUR DE LUMINESCENCE

Publication

EP 2028250 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07744908 A

Priority

  • JP 2007061582 W
  • JP 2006159756 A

Abstract (en)

An object of the present invention is to provide a luminescence enhancer by which a luminescence such as chemiluminescence can be enhanced with higher sensitivity and the luminescence can be continued over a prolonged period of time. That is, the present invention provides a luminescence enhancer containing a heteropolymer as an active ingredient, a method for measuring the luminescence using a luminescent substrate and said luminescence enhancer, and a method for analyzing a substance to be measured in a specimen wherein the specimen, an antigen and/or antibody corresponding to a substance to be measured, an antigen and/or antibody labeled-form with an activator and a luminescent substrate are reacted in the presence of said luminescence enhancer to measure the luminescence.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/07 (2006.01); C08F 212/14 (2006.01); C08F 212/36 (2006.01); C08F 220/34 (2006.01); C08F 226/06 (2006.01); C08L 57/06 (2006.01); C12Q 1/42 (2006.01); G01N 21/76 (2006.01); G01N 33/532 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/582 (2013.01); C08F 212/14 (2013.01); C08F 226/06 (2013.01); C09K 11/06 (2013.01); C09K 11/07 (2013.01); G01N 21/76 (2013.01); G01N 33/52 (2013.01); G01N 33/532 (2013.01); C08F 212/36 (2013.01); C08F 220/06 (2013.01); C09K 2211/1007 (2013.01); C09K 2211/1088 (2013.01); G01N 2333/916 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 212/14 + C08F 226/06

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028250 A1 20090225; EP 2028250 A4 20100721; JP WO2007142314 A1 20091029; US 2009081696 A1 20090326; WO 2007142314 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120412

2011-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110524

2011-04-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-07-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100618

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS