Global Patent Index - EP 2028263 A1

EP 2028263 A1 2009-02-25 - Use of fabric softener to minimize loss of reslient properties in a fabric

Title (en)

Use of fabric softener to minimize loss of reslient properties in a fabric

Title (de)

Verwendung eines Weichspülers zur Minimierung des Elastizitätsverlustes bei Fasern

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'adoucissant pour textiles pour minimiser la perte de propriétés de souplesse d'un tissu

Publication

EP 2028263 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07253281 A

Priority

EP 07253281 A

Abstract (en)

Use of fabric softener to minimize the loss of at least one resilience property of a fabric by contacting the fabric with fabric softener.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/30 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2013.01); D06M 13/224 (2013.01); D06M 13/46 (2013.01); D06M 13/463 (2013.01); D06M 2200/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] FLICK W: "Products for The Textile Industry", TEXTILE FINISHING CHEMICALS, XX, XX, 1990, pages 587, XP008087858
  • [X] JUODSNUKYTE D ET AL: "Influence of fabric softeners on performance stability of the textile materials", MATERIALS SCIENCE EDITORIAL BOARD OF JOURNAL MATERIALS SCIENCE LITHUANIA, vol. 11, no. 2, 2005, pages 179 - 182, XP009095848, ISSN: 1392-1320
  • [X] TRUNCYTE D ET AL: "The change of handle properties of knitted farics influenced by washing process", MEDZIAGOTYRA - MATERIALS SCIENCE, KAUNO TECHNOLOGIJOS UNIVERSITETAS,, LT, vol. 12, no. 2, 2006, pages 158 - 161, XP008087855, ISSN: 1392-1320

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028263 A1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110301

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090617

2009-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090526

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS