Global Patent Index - EP 2028282 A1

EP 2028282 A1 2009-02-25 - Dual-phase steel, flat product made of such dual-phase steel and method for manufacturing a flat product

Title (en)

Dual-phase steel, flat product made of such dual-phase steel and method for manufacturing a flat product

Title (de)

Dualphasenstahl, Flachprodukt aus einem solchen Dualphasenstahl und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Flachprodukts

Title (fr)

Acier en phase double, produit plat à partir d'un tel acier en phase double et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 2028282 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07114398 A

Priority

EP 07114398 A

Abstract (en)

Dual-phase steel comprises 20-70% of martensite, up to 8% of residual austenite and balance of ferrite and/or bainite and which possess a tensile strength of at least 950 MPa, and composition of carbon (0.1-0.2 wt.%), silicon (0.1-0.6 wt.%), manganese (1.5-2.5 wt.%), chromium (0.2-0.8 wt.%), titanium (0.02-0.08 wt.%), boron (less than 0.002 wt.%), molybdenum (less than 0.25 wt.%), aluminum (less than 0.1 wt.%), phosphorus (= 0.2 wt.%), sulfur (= 0.01 wt.%), nitrogen (= 0.012 wt.%) and balance of iron and unavoidable contamination. Independent claims are included for: (1) a flat product comprising the dual-phase steel; (2) production of a hot laminated strip with a tensile strength of at least 950 MPa and a dual phase structure, comprising melting the dual-phase steel, pouring the melt to a preproduct such as slab or thin slab, reheating or holding the preproduct at a hot rolling starting temperature of 1100-1300[deg] C, hot rolling the preproduct at a hot rolling temperature of 800-950[deg] C to the hot laminated strip and winding the hot laminated strip at a winder temperature of up to 570[deg] C; and (3) production of a cold strip with a tensile strength of at least 950 MPa and a dual phase structure, comprising melting the composite dual-phase steel, pouring the melt to a preproduct such as slab or thin slab, reheating or holding the preproduct at a hot rolling starting temperature of 1100-1300[deg] C, hot rolling the preproduct at a hot rolling temperature of 800-950[deg] C to the hot laminated strip, winding the hot laminated strip at a winder temperature of 500-650[deg] C, carrying out cold rolling of the hot laminated strip after the winding step, tempering the cold strip to a tempering temperature of 700-900[deg] C and controlled cooling of the tempered cold strip.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung stellt einen Dualphasenstahl, ein daraus hergestelltes Flachprodukt, z.B. Stahlblech und ein Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung zur Verfügung. Der Dualphasenstahl weist neben einer Festigkeit von mindestens 950 MPa und einer guten Verformbarkeit auch eine Oberflächenbeschaffenheit auf, die es unter Anwendung eines einfachen Herstellverfahrens erlaubt, das aus diesem Stahl erzeugte Flachprodukt im unbeschichteten oder mit einem vor Korrosion schützenden Überzug versehenen Zustand zu einem komplex geformten Bauteil, wie einem Teil einer Automobilkarosserie, zu verformen. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, dass der erfindungsgemäße Stahl zu 20 - 70 % aus Martensit, bis zu 8 % aus Restaustenit und als Rest aus Ferrit und / oder Bainit besteht und (in Gew.-%): C : 0,10 - 0,20 %, Si: 0,10 - 0,60 %, Mn: 1,50 - 2,50 %, Cr: 0,20 - 0,80 %, Ti: 0,02 - 0,08 %, B: < 0,0020 %, Mo: < 0,25 %, Al: < 0,10 %, P: ‰¤ 0,2 %, S: ‰¤ 0,01 %, N: ‰¤ 0,012 % und als Rest Eisen und unvermeidbare Verunreinigungen enthält. Das Blech ist als Warmband oder Kaltband verwendbar. Vorzugsweise weist das Blech eine Dehnung > 10% und eine Streckgrenze > 580 MPa auf.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/28 (2006.01); C22C 38/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/28 (2013.01); C22C 38/38 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12799 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12972 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028282 A1 20090225; EP 2028282 B1 20120613; CN 101802233 A 20100811; CN 101802233 B 20130814; ES 2387040 T3 20120912; JP 2010535946 A 20101125; JP 5486496 B2 20140507; PL 2028282 T3 20121130; US 2010273024 A1 20101028; WO 2009021897 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-07-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070815

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120815

2014-04-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2013-11-29 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120815

2013-07-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120913

2013-07-04 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007010035

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-05-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2013-03-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-03-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121015

2013-01-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2013-01-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2013-01-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121013

2013-01-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2013-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-11-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120914

2012-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-11-30 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-11-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120613

2012-09-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2387040 T3

- Effective date: 20120912

2012-09-05 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-08-09 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007010035

- Effective date: 20120809

2012-07-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-06-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 562062 T

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2012-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOCHAROVA, EKATERINA

2012-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HELLER, THOMAS

2012-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATTISSEN, DOROTHEA

2012-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NICKELS, THOMAS

2012-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STICH, GUENTER

2012-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STRAUSS, SILKE

2012-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOCHAROVA, EKATERINA

2012-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HELLER, THOMAS

2012-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATTISSEN, DOROTHEA

2012-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NICKELS, THOMAS

2012-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STICH, GUENTER

2012-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STRAUSS, SILKE

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C21D 8/02 20060101AFI20120126BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C21D 9/46 20060101ALI20120126BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22C 38/02 20060101ALI20120126BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22C 38/04 20060101ALI20120126BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22C 38/28 20060101ALI20120126BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22C 38/38 20060101ALI20120126BHEP

2009-11-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL EUROPE AG

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090902

2009-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOCHAROVA, EKATERINA

2009-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HELLER, THOMAS

2009-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATTISSEN, DOROTHEA

2009-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NICKELS, THOMAS

2009-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STICH, GUENTER

2009-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STRAUSS, SILKE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS