Global Patent Index - EP 2028284 A1

EP 2028284 A1 2009-02-25 - HIGH-STRENGTH SEAMLESS STEEL PIPE FOR MECHANICAL STRUCTURE WHICH HAS EXCELLENT TOUGHNESS AND WELDABILITY, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF

Title (en)

HIGH-STRENGTH SEAMLESS STEEL PIPE FOR MECHANICAL STRUCTURE WHICH HAS EXCELLENT TOUGHNESS AND WELDABILITY, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF

Title (de)

HOCHFESTES NAHTLOSES STAHLROHR FÜR MECHANISCHE KONSTRUKTION MIT HERVORRAGENDER ZÄHIGKEIT UND SCHWEISSBARKEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

TUYAU EN ACIER SANS SOUDURE HAUTEMENT RESISTANT AVEC UNE TENACITE ET UNE SOUDABILITE EXCELLENTES POUR STRUCTURE MECANIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 2028284 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07740796 A

Priority

  • JP 2007057360 W
  • JP 2006087723 A

Abstract (en)

A high strength seamless steel pipe for machine structure use superior in toughness and weldability characterized by containing, by mass%, C: 0.03 to less than 0.1%, Mn: 0.8 to 2.5%, Ti: 0.005 to 0.035%, Nb: 0.003 to 0.04%, and B: 0.0003 to 0.003%, limiting Si: 0.5% or less, Al: 0.05% or less, P: 0.015% or less, S: 0.008% or less, and N: 0.008% or less, further containing one or more of Ni: 0.1 to 1.5%, Cr: 0.1 to 1.5%, Cu: 0.1 to 1.0%, and Mo: 0.05 to 0.5%, and having a balance of Fe and unavoidable impurities, the metallurgical structure being a single phase structure of self-tempered martensite or a mixed phase structure of self-tempered martensite and lower bainite.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); B21B 17/00 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01); B21C 23/08 (2006.01); C21D 8/10 (2006.01); C21D 9/08 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 23/00 (2013.01); C21D 1/25 (2013.01); C21D 8/10 (2013.01); C21D 9/08 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/12 (2013.01); C22C 38/14 (2013.01); C21D 2211/002 (2013.01); C21D 2211/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028284 A1 20090225; EP 2028284 A4 20101222; EP 2028284 B1 20120516; CN 101410542 A 20090415; CN 101410542 B 20130417; JP 2007262468 A 20071011; JP 4751224 B2 20110817; WO 2007114413 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-06-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007022679

- Effective date: 20130219

2013-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130219

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NIPPON STEEL CORP., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 602007022679

- Effective date: 20130227

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007022679

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130227

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007022679

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20130227

2013-01-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION

2012-07-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007022679

- Effective date: 20120712

2012-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2012-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION

2010-12-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101118

2009-08-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-07-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080929

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS