Global Patent Index - EP 2028299 A2

EP 2028299 A2 2009-02-25 - Opening roller with clip connector

Title (en)

Opening roller with clip connector

Title (de)

Auflösewalze mit Clipverbindung

Title (fr)

Cylindre d'ouverture de ruban muni d'un assemblage à clip

Publication

EP 2028299 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08153018 A

Priority

DE 102007037229 A

Abstract (en)

The roller (1) has a fitting support (7) supporting a fitting and fastened to a base (2) by a clip connection (8) having a clip element in an axial direction. A connecting device is provided for form fit connection of the base and support. The connecting device has a projection in a circumferential direction, and a recess that cooperates with the projection. The projection forms a detent collar of the clip connection, and is arranged at a cylindrical inner surface of the support. The recess is arranged at the base, where a receiver made of metal e.g. aluminum or brass, is molded into the base.

Abstract (de)

Eine Auflösewalze (1) für eine Offenendspinnvorrichtung (6) weist einen Grundkörper (2) auf, über den die Auflösewalze (1) auf einer antreibbaren Welle (4) befestigt ist, und einen eine Garnitur tragenden Garniturträger (7), welcher durch eine Clipverbindung (8) in axialer Richtung an dem Grundkörper (2) befestigt ist. Weiterhin weist die Auflösewalze (1) eine Vorrichtung zur formschlüssigen Verbindung von Grundkörper (2) und Garniturträger (7) in Umfangsrichtung mit einem Vorsprung (13) und einer mit diesem zusammenwirkenden Ausnehmung (14) auf. Ein Garniturträger (7) einer Auflösewalze (1) für eine Offenendspinnvorrichtung (6) ist durch eine Clipverbindung (8) in axialer Richtung an einem Grundkörper (2) der Auflösewalze (1) befestigbar. Der Garniturträger (7) weist einen Vorsprung (13) zur formschlüssigen Verbindung mit dem Grundkörper (2) in Umfangsrichtung auf. Der Vorsprung (13) bildet zugleich eine Rastschulter (12) der Clipverbindung (8). Ein Grundkörper (2) einer Auflösewalze (1) für eine Offenendspinnvorrichtung (6) ist in Umfangsrichtung durch eine Vorrichtung zur formschlüssigen Verbindung mit einem Vorsprung (13) und einer mit diesem zusammenwirkenden Ausnehmung (14) mit einem Garniturträger (7) der Auflösewalze verbindbar. An dem Grundkörper ist der Garniturträger (7) in axialer Richtung durch eine Clipverbindung (8) befestigbar. Der Grundkörper (2) besteht aus einem Kunststoffmaterial und ein Clipelement (11) der Clipverbindung (8) ist einteilig mit dem Grundkörper (2) ausgebildet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 99/00 (2010.01); D01H 4/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/32 (2013.01); Y10T 403/606 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028299 A2 20090225; EP 2028299 A3 20110511; EP 2028299 B1 20120516; CN 101363150 A 20090211; CN 101363150 B 20110720; DE 102007037229 A1 20090212; ES 2387514 T3 20120925; US 2009038576 A1 20090212; US 2012260464 A1 20121018; US 8210766 B2 20120703; US 8490376 B2 20130723

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502008007200

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-05-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20150316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130320

2014-10-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141010

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-06-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008007200

- Effective date: 20130219

2013-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130219

2012-09-25 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2387514 T3

- Effective date: 20120925

2012-07-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008007200

- Effective date: 20120712

2012-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT TR

2012-01-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT TR

2011-11-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20111015

2011-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-05-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS