Global Patent Index - EP 2028300 A2

EP 2028300 A2 2009-02-25 - Device for controlling and reducing the tension pulsations in the feed of four-for-one twisting spindles

Title (en)

Device for controlling and reducing the tension pulsations in the feed of four-for-one twisting spindles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Kontrollieren und Senken der Spannungsimpulse in der Fadenzulieferung von 4-zu-1 Zwirnspindeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle et de réduction des pulsations de tension dans l'alimentation d'une broche retordeuse quatre en un

Publication

EP 2028300 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08160624 A

Priority

IT MI20071578 A

Abstract (en)

Device for controlling and stabilising the feed tension in four-for-one twisting spindles wherein a rotating unwinder rotates by following the unwinding of the feed yarn that re-ascends an internal axial cavity up to a deflecting bell-shaped transmission element, from which the inner balloon of the four-for-one twisting spindle begins, where the deflecting bell-shaped element is rendered idle with respect to the unwinder below.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2006.01); D01H 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2013.01); D01H 13/10 (2013.01); D01H 13/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028300 A2 20090225; EP 2028300 A3 20091230; CN 101358393 A 20090204; CN 101358393 B 20111214; IT MI20071578 A1 20090202

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130103

2010-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI TR

2010-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100721

2010-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100623

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01H 7/86 20060101AFI20090116BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01H 13/10 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2009-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS