Global Patent Index - EP 2028301 A2

EP 2028301 A2 2009-02-25 - Compensation device of the tension pulsations in four-for-one twisting spindles

Title (en)

Compensation device of the tension pulsations in four-for-one twisting spindles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ausgleich der Spannungsimpulse in 4:1-Zwirnspindeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de compensation pour les pulsations de tensions dans des broches de torsion quatre en un

Publication

EP 2028301 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08160642 A

Priority

IT MI20071579 A

Abstract (en)

Device for compensating the feed tension in four-for-one twisting spindles in which a doubled yarn is unwound from a rotating unwinder which rotates by following the unwinding of the feed yarn, in which the yarn re-ascends a re-ascending internal axial cavity in which a compensator device is inserted, which lengthens and shortens the run of the yarn at its interior as a function of its tension.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2006.01); D01H 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2013.01); D01H 13/10 (2013.01); D01H 13/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028301 A2 20090225; EP 2028301 A3 20091230; EP 2028301 B1 20160106; CN 101358394 A 20090204; CN 101358394 B 20111214; IT MI20071579 A1 20090202

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170716

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170706

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20161007

2016-10-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008041765

2016-02-25 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008041765

2016-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI AND PARTNERS SA, CH

2016-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-01-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI TR

2015-09-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150811

2012-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAVIO MACCHINE TESSILI S.P.A.

2012-08-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAVIO MACCHINE TESSILI S.P.A.

2010-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI TR

2010-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100721

2010-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100623

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01H 7/86 20060101AFI20090116BHEP

2010-01-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01H 13/10 20060101ALI20091126BHEP

2009-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS