Global Patent Index - EP 2028302 A2

EP 2028302 A2 2009-02-25 - Spinning unit and process for operating of such spinning unit

Title (en)

Spinning unit and process for operating of such spinning unit

Title (de)

Spinnanlage und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer solchen Spinnanlage

Title (fr)

Unité de filature et procédé de fonctionement d'une telle unité de filature

Publication

EP 2028302 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013051 A

Previously Filed Application

102007039049 20070817 DE

Priority

DE 102007039049 A

Abstract (en)

Spinning device comprises ring spinners (1) with operating cycles controlled by a common control unit (6) so that all the ring spinners simultaneously complete their cops and the process of cop exchange can be simultaneously carried out on all the spinners. A transport unit (3) removes the cops after cop exchange on the spinners. Preferred Features: A signal for starting the cop exchange process is fed to the control unit when the cop exchange regions of the spinners with empty holding pins and regions of the transport unit with empty sleeves are placed opposite each other.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Spinnanlage mit Ringspinnmaschinen 1 und Spulmaschinen 2, wobei den Ringspinnmaschinen eine einheitliche Transportvorrichtung 3 zugeordnet ist, auf die selbsttätige Kopswechselvorrichtungen der Ringspinnmaschinen ihre Kopse absetzen. Um unnötige und zeitraubende Fahrbewegungen der Transportvorrichtung zu vermeiden, wird durch eine den Ringspinnmaschinen gemeinsame Steuervorrichtung 6 gewährleistet, dass die Ringspinnmaschinen absolut synchron laufen und ihren Kopswechsel daher gleichzeitig ausführen können.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/00 (2013.01); D01H 9/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 10137140 C1 20030109 - ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028302 A2 20090225; EP 2028302 A3 20110518; BR PI0803423 A2 20090505; CN 101368304 A 20090218; DE 102007039049 A1 20090219; JP 2009046797 A 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121123

2012-01-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI TR

2011-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-05-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS