Global Patent Index - EP 2028303 A2

EP 2028303 A2 2009-02-25 - Winding apparatus with Fiber dust collecting device

Title (en)

Winding apparatus with Fiber dust collecting device

Title (de)

Spulvorrichtung mit Faserstaubsammelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Bobinoir avec Dispositif de collecte de poussière de fibre

Publication

EP 2028303 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08012483 A

Priority

JP 2007215302 A

Abstract (en)

A fiber dust collecting device according to the present invention includes a suction nozzle 35 located away from a balloon guide 20 of an unwinding assisting device 2 and an elevating and lowering means 22. The fiber dust collecting device is configured such that the elevating and lowering means 22 displaces the suction nozzle 35 downward in conjunction with progress of the operation of unwinding a yarn from a supplying bobbin B so that a suction opening 42 of the suction nozzle 35 faces an unwinding position 29 on the supplying bobbin B and a balloon formation area in which an unwound yarn forms a balloon (Fig. 1).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 11/00 (2006.01); B65H 54/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 11/005 (2013.01); B65H 54/702 (2013.01); B65H 57/22 (2013.01); D01H 1/00 (2013.01); D01H 1/003 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H05139621 A 19930608 - MURATA MACHINERY LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028303 A2 20090225; EP 2028303 A3 20100106; EP 2028303 B1 20110914; CN 101372297 A 20090225; CN 101372297 B 20120718; JP 2009046267 A 20090305; JP 4403519 B2 20100127

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-10-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008009707

- Effective date: 20120615

2012-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120615

2011-11-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008009707

- Effective date: 20111110

2011-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2011-03-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WINDING APPARATUS WITH FIBER DUST COLLECTING DEVICE

2010-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2010-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01H 11/00 20060101AFI20090116BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 54/70 20060101ALI20091203BHEP

2010-01-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-01-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS