Global Patent Index - EP 2028304 A2

EP 2028304 A2 2009-02-25 - Sliver piecing device

Title (en)

Sliver piecing device

Title (de)

Anstückelungsvorrichtung für Faserbänder

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rattache de rubans

Publication

EP 2028304 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08011813 A

Priority

JP 2007213340 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention allows sliver ends to be stably pieced together so that the resulting slivers exhibit a required strength. A sliver piecing device includes a pair of piecing members 1, 1' that slide alternately with ends S11, S11' of a pair of slivers S, S' sandwiched between the piecing members 1, 1' to rub and piece the ends together. The piecing members 1, 1' both comprise respective entanglement preventing groove portions 10, 10' preventing entanglement during rubbing, on respective surfaces 1a, 1a' between which the sliver ends S11, S11' are sandwiched. Each of the entanglement preventing groove portions 10, 10' is formed in a central portion of the sandwiching surface 1a, 1a' so as to extend in a sliding direction 1b, 1b' (Fig. 12).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 15/00 (2013.01); D01H 9/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H09105036 A 19970422 - MURATA MACHINERY LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028304 A2 20090225; EP 2028304 A3 20140219; EP 2028304 B1 20150805; JP 2009046771 A 20090305; JP 4962726 B2 20120627

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160509

2016-05-09 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008039354

2016-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602008039354

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2016-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602008039354

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2015-09-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008039354

2015-08-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2015-03-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150205

2014-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2014-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-02-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2014-02-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01H 15/00 20060101AFI20140116BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS