Global Patent Index - EP 2028306 A1

EP 2028306 A1 2009-02-25 - Double bar Rachel loom

Title (en)

Double bar Rachel loom

Title (de)

Doppelbarren-Raschelmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à tricoter Rachel à double barre

Publication

EP 2028306 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07114892 A

Priority

EP 07114892 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has yarn stacks (8h, 8v) arranged at both sides of an active site (10), and comprising a pair of endless longitudinal conveyors (13h, 13v) i.e. flight conveyors. The conveyors convey the yarns continuously to the active point, where the yarns are stored by feeder devices (12h, 12v) on the conveyors. The conveyors have opposite direction of travel (36h, 36v) whose movement paths running in perpendicular planes penetrate with each other. The active site is provided at an edge of a penetration region (38) which is enclosed by the conveyors.

Abstract (de)

Zur Herstellung eines Abstandsgewirkes, bei dem die Deckflächen durch zusätzliche Steh- und/oder Kettfäden verstärkt werden, wird eine Doppelbarren-Raschelmaschine mit zwei Gruppen von Schussfaden-Magazinen versehen, zu denen zwei Gruppen von Längsförderern (13h,v) gehören. Die Längsförderer (13h,v) der beiden Paare laufen mit entgegengesetzter Laufrichtung (36h,v) aufeinander zu. Sie durchlaufen dabei nacheinander einen waagerechten Vorlegebereich (14h,v), in dem die Schussfäden abgelegt werden, danach einen schwach geneigten Zulaufbereich (15h,v), einen stärker geneigten ersten Rücklaufbereich (16h,v) und anschließend ihren übrigen Rücklaufbereich (17h,v). Das Besondere besteht darin, dass die Bewegungsbahnen der beiden Paare von Längsförderern (13h,v) einander durchdringen und einen Durchdringungsbereich (38) ausbilden. Dabei kreuzen sich die Bewegungsbahnen der beiden Paare von Längsförderern (13h,v) an der Ablenkungsstelle (39h,v) zwischen dem schwach geneigten Zulaufbereich (15h,v) und dem stärker geneigten Rücklaufbereich (16h,v). Diese Kreuzungsstelle befindet sich an der Wirkstelle der Doppelbarren-Raschelmaschine. Durch diese Ausbildung gelingt eine kompakte Bauweise, wobei die Schussfäden durch die Schussfaden-Magazine mit großer Geschwindigkeit an die Wirkstelle herangeführt werden können. Die Doppelbarren-Raschelmaschine dieser Bauart hat somit eine hohe Produktionsgeschwindigkeit.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 21/02 (2006.01); D04B 23/02 (2006.01); D04B 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 21/16 (2013.01); D04B 21/10 (2013.01); D04B 23/02 (2013.01); D04B 23/12 (2013.01); D10B 2403/021 (2013.01); D10B 2403/02412 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028306 A1 20090225; EP 2028306 B1 20100331; CN 101525808 A 20090909; CN 101525808 B 20110824; DE 502007003317 D1 20100512; ES 2342570 T3 20100708

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-12-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KARL MAYER TECHNISCHE TEXTILIEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LIBA MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, 95119 NAILA, DE

- Document: DE 502007003317

2015-12-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KARL MAYER TECHNISCHE TEXTILIEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LIBA-MASCHINENFABRIK GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 95119 NAILA, DE

- Document: DE 502007003317

2015-12-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007003317

- Representative's name: FROHWITTER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130824

2014-09-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140909

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130823

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 6

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110104

2010-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2010-07-08 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2342570 T3

2010-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003317 P 20100512

2010-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2010-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2009-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090402

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS