Global Patent Index - EP 2028307 A1

EP 2028307 A1 2009-02-25 - Method and device for placing a unidirectional thread layer on longitudinal conveyors, method for laying weft threads on warp knitting machines, and device to carry out said methods

Title (en)

Method and device for placing a unidirectional thread layer on longitudinal conveyors, method for laying weft threads on warp knitting machines, and device to carry out said methods

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen einer unidirektionalen Lage aus Fäden auf Längsförderer, Verfahren zum Vorlegen von Schussfäden an Kettenwirkmaschinen sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieser Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif destinés à déposer une couche de fils unidirectionnels sur des convoyeurs longitudinaux, procédé de présentation des fils de trame sur métiers à tricoter chaîne, et dispositif permettant de mettre en oeuvre ces procédés

Publication

EP 2028307 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07114893 A

Priority

EP 07114893 A

Abstract (en)

The unidirectional thread application process is for laying threads on two longitudinal conveyors spaced out from each other, with fixing hooks (3, 4) for the endless thread supplied by feeders for laying in a unidirectional layer. There is a feeder (10, 11) for each conveyor (1, 2), moving two-dimensionally in movement plane running in laying plane.

Abstract (de)

Bei Kettenwirkmaschinen und Multiaxialmaschinen müssen unidirektionale Lagen aus Fäden (8) auf bewegte Längsförderer (1, 2) aufgebracht und in Befestigungshaken (3, 3a, 3b bzw. 4, 4a, 4b) eingehängt werden, die sich an den Längsförderern (1, 2) befinden. Die Längsförderer (1, 2) bewegen sich in der Transportrichtung (5). Die Fäden (8) werden von einem Vorrat (6) abgezogen und über eine Umlenkrolle (9) einem ersten Zubringer (10) zugeführt, der sie in die Befestigungshaken (3, 3a, 3b) des ersten Längsförderers (1) einhängt. Ein zweiter Zubringer (11) hängt anschließend den Faden (8) in die Befestigungshaken (4, 4a, 4b) des zweiten Längsförderers (2) ein. Die beiden Zubringer (10, 11) bewegen sich in Richtung von zwei senkrecht zueinander verlaufenden Achsen x und y und beschreiben dabei geschlossene Bewegungsbahnen (14 und 15). Zum Ergreifen der Fäden (8) sind die Zubringer (10, 11) mit Halteklauen (12, 13) ausgestattet. Das Verfahren kann auch mit einem Fadenführer arbeiten, wobei die Zubringer (10, 11) dann Versatzrechen sind. Die fertige Fadenlage wird einer Verbindungsstation (7) oder den Wirkwerkzeugen einer Kettenwirkmaschine zugeführt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/10 (2006.01); D04B 23/12 (2006.01); D04H 3/011 (2012.01); D04H 3/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/04 (2013.01); D04B 23/12 (2013.01); D04H 3/011 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028307 A1 20090225; EP 2028307 B1 20100331; CN 101525809 A 20090909; CN 101525809 B 20120815; DE 502007003318 D1 20100512; ES 2342682 T3 20100712

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502007003318

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120823

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-03-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100824

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110104

2010-07-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2342682 T3

2010-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2010-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003318 P 20100512

2010-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2010-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2009-08-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PLACING A UNIDIRECTIONAL THREAD LAYER ON LONGITUDINAL CONVEYORS, METHOD FOR LAYING WEFT THREADS ON WARP KNITTING MACHINES, AND DEVICE TO CARRY OUT SAID METH

2009-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090402

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS