Global Patent Index - EP 2028310 A2

EP 2028310 A2 2009-02-25 - Sewing machine

Title (en)

Sewing machine

Title (de)

Nähautomat

Title (fr)

Machine à coudre

Publication

EP 2028310 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014257 A

Priority

DE 202007011790 U

Abstract (en)

The automat (1) has a sewing machine (22), a work piece transporting device for transporting a work piece (2) during sewing, and a stitch guiding device. The stitch guiding device comprises a guiding link and a guiding element that is guided to the guiding link. The guiding link is fixedly connected to a work piece supporting plate (3), and the guiding element is fixedly connected to the transporting device. The guiding element is guided to the link at two different guiding distances in two guiding positions for producing respective stitches.

Abstract (de)

Ein Nähautomat zum Nähen zweier parallel zueinander verlaufender Nähte in einem Nähgut umfasst eine Nähmaschine, eine Nähgut-Transporteinrichtung zum Transport des Nähguts während des Nähens sowie eine Nahtführungseinrichtung (25) mit einer Führungskulisse (26) und einem Führungskörper (28) als Führungselemente. Der Führungskörper (28) wird an der Führungskulisse (26) zur Vorgabe einer Nahtform geführt, wobei eines der Führungselemente (26) starr mit einer Nähgut-Auflageplatte und das andere der Führungselemente (28) starr mit der Nähgut-Transporteinrichtung verbunden ist. Des Weiteren ist der Führungskörper (28) hubverlagerbar zwischen mindestens zwei Führungsstellungen und ist in der ersten Führungsstellung zur Erzeugung der ersten Naht in einem ersten Führungsabstand zur Führungskulisse (26) geführt, während er in der zweiten Führungsstellung zur Erzeugung der zweiten Naht in einem zweiten, im Vergleich zum ersten größeren Führungsabstand zur Führungskulisse (26) geführt ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 3/12 (2006.01); D05B 3/04 (2006.01); D05B 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 3/12 (2013.01); D05B 3/04 (2013.01); D05B 35/02 (2013.01); D05D 2303/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007011790 U1 20090102; CN 101372793 A 20090225; EP 2028310 A2 20090225; EP 2028310 A3 20111019; JP 2009050700 A 20090312; KR 20090020523 A 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-08-16 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-06-27 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2012-06-27 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-10-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D05B 3/12 20060101AFI20110915BHEP

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D05B 35/02 20060101ALI20110915BHEP

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D05B 3/04 20060101ALI20110915BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS