Global Patent Index - EP 2028311 A2

EP 2028311 A2 2009-02-25 - Sewing machine and method for sewing a beginning of a seam with such a sewing machine

Title (en)

Sewing machine and method for sewing a beginning of a seam with such a sewing machine

Title (de)

Nähmaschine sowie Verfahren zum Nähen eines Nahtanfangs mit einer derartigen Nähmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à coudre et procédé destiné à coudre un début de couture à l'aide d'une telle machine à coudre

Publication

EP 2028311 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014040 A

Priority

DE 102007039596 A

Abstract (en)

The sewing machine has a stringing device (24), which is arranged in an upper thread course between a thread take-up lever (18) and another upper thread clamp (28) and is controlled in a transposable manner between a neutral position and a stringing position. The upper thread (9) takes a thread path between the thread take-up lever and the upper thread-main clamping device (21) in the neutral position. The upper thread takes another thread path between the thread take-up lever and the upper thread-main clamping device in the stringing position. An independent claim is included for a method for sewing a beginning of a seam with a sewing machine.

Abstract (de)

Eine Nähmaschine hat einen Vorrat für einen Oberfaden (9). Eine Nadelstange (7) mit einer Nähnadel (8) dient zur Führung des Oberfadens (9) durch ein Nähgut. Ein Greifer (10) dient zum Erfassen des Oberfadens (9) während einer Stichbildung. Eine erste Oberfadenklemme (14) ist im vorratsseitigen Oberfadenverlauf zwischen dem Greifer (10) und einem Fadenhebel (18) angeordnet. Eine Oberfaden-Hauptspanneinrichtung (21) ist im vorratsseitigen Oberfadenverlauf vor der ersten Oberfadenklemme (14) angeordnet. Eine zweite ansteuerbare Oberfadenklemme (28) ist im vorratsseitigen Oberfadenverlauf vor der Oberfaden-Hauptspanneinrichtung (21) angeordnet. Zwischen dem Fadenhebel (18) und der zweiten Oberfadenklemme (28) ist eine Fadenzieheinrichtung (24) angeordnet. Diese ist gesteuert umstellbar zwischen einer Neutralstellung und einer Fadenziehstellung, wobei der Weg des Oberfadens (9) in der Fadenziehstellung um eine Fadenweg-Differenz länger ist als in der Neutralstellung. Es resultiert eine Nähmaschine, bei der auf betriebssichere Weise ein kurzes am Nahtanfang aus dem Nähgut herausstehendes Oberfadenstück gewährleistet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 47/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 47/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CZ DE RO

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2028311 A2 20090225; EP 2028311 A3 20111019; EP 2028311 B1 20131009; CN 101372797 A 20090225; CN 101372797 B 20130102; DE 102007039596 A1 20090226; JP 2009045468 A 20090305; JP 5508698 B2 20140604; KR 101410571 B1 20140623; KR 20090020495 A 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-10-23 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010776

- Effective date: 20140710

2014-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140710

2014-07-10 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010776

2013-12-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008010776

- Effective date: 20131205

2013-12-04 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2013-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CZ DE RO

2013-06-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130523

2013-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130124

2012-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D05B 47/04 20060101AFI20121031BHEP

2012-10-31 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502008010776

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: D05B0047020000

- IPC: D05B0047040000

2012-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CZ DE RO

2012-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-10-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D05B 47/00 20060101AFI20110915BHEP

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS